This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:31:06 (UTC).

JEAN PIERRE KLEIN VS. UNIVERSAL SERVICES OF AMERICA, LP

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 JEAN PIERRE KLEIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UNIVERSAL SERVICES OF AMERICA, LP. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JEAN PIERRE KLEIN

LUCINDA KLEIN

Defendant and Debtor

UNIVERSAL SERVICES OF AMERICA GP, INC.

Defendants, Debtors and Cross Defendants

UNIVERSAL SERVICES OF AMERICA, LP

UNIVERSAL SERVICES OF AMERICA GP, INC.

DAVIS PARTNERS INCORPORATED

ANTONIO MCCLURE

CG LANDSCAPE, INC.

ABM ONSITE-WEST, INC.

UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE, LP

DAVIS REALTY PARTNERS LLC

UNIVERSAL PROTRCTION GP, LLC

ABM INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

UNIVERSAL PROTECTION GP, LLC

UNIVERSAL PROTECTIONS SERVICE, LP

ABM INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED, A DELAWA

Defendants, Others and Cross Defendants

CG LANDSCAPE, INC.

ABM ONSITE-WEST, INC.

UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE, LP

UNIVERSAL PROTRCTION GP, LLC

UNIVERSAL PROTECTION GP, LLC

ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS, LLC

ANTONIO MCCLURE

DAVIS REALTY PARTNERS LLC

Not Classified By Court

PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPA

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOLEY BEZEK BEHLE & CURTIS, LLP

Defendant, Other and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BRADLEY & GMELICH LLP

ROPERS, MAJESKI, KOHN & BENTLEY

SHOECRAFT & BURTON LLP

PETTIT KOHN INGRASSIA LUTZ & DOLIN PC

MURCHISON & CUMMING, LLP

Not Classified By Court Attorney

WOOLLS PEER DOLLINGER & SCHER

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 08/30/2018 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 08/30/2018 01:30:00 PM.

MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA (AMENDED) FILED BY ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS, LLC ON 11/28/2018

MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA (AMENDED) FILED BY ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS, LLC ON 11/28/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY DAVIS REALTY PARTNERS LLC ON 03/08/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY DAVIS REALTY PARTNERS LLC ON 03/08/2019

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY CG LANDSCAPE, INC. ON 09/20/2018

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY CG LANDSCAPE, INC. ON 09/20/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/29/2019

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/29/2019

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/30/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/30/2018

OPPOSITION FILED BY MCCLURE, ANTONIO; DAVIS REALTY PARTNERS LLC; UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE, LP ON 10/29/2018

OPPOSITION FILED BY MCCLURE, ANTONIO; DAVIS REALTY PARTNERS LLC; UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE, LP ON 10/29/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/19/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/19/2018

REQUEST - OTHER (TO BE HEARD ON COURT'S STATEMENT OF INTENT TO REVERSE RULING) FILED BY CG LANDSCAPE, INC. ON 12/10/2018

REQUEST - OTHER (TO BE HEARD ON COURT'S STATEMENT OF INTENT TO REVERSE RULING) FILED BY CG LANDSCAPE, INC. ON 12/10/2018

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY MCCLURE, ANTONIO; DAVIS REALTY PARTNERS LLC; UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE, LP ON 10/29/2018

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY MCCLURE, ANTONIO; DAVIS REALTY PARTNERS LLC; UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE, LP ON 10/29/2018

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY KLEIN, JEAN PIERRE; KLEIN, LUCINDA ON 11/19/2018

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY KLEIN, JEAN PIERRE; KLEIN, LUCINDA ON 11/19/2018

OPPOSITION FILED BY KLEIN, JEAN PIERRE; KLEIN, LUCINDA ON 10/29/2018

OPPOSITION FILED BY KLEIN, JEAN PIERRE; KLEIN, LUCINDA ON 10/29/2018

OPPOSITION FILED BY KLEIN, JEAN PIERRE; KLEIN, LUCINDA ON 11/08/2018

OPPOSITION FILED BY KLEIN, JEAN PIERRE; KLEIN, LUCINDA ON 11/08/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DAVIS REALTY PARTNERS LLC ON 12/18/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DAVIS REALTY PARTNERS LLC ON 12/18/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DAVIS REALTY PARTNERS LLC ON 01/09/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DAVIS REALTY PARTNERS LLC ON 01/09/2018

MOTION - OTHER (FOR PREFERENCE) FILED BY KLEIN, JEAN PIERRE; KLEIN, LUCINDA ON 07/19/2018

MOTION - OTHER (FOR PREFERENCE) FILED BY KLEIN, JEAN PIERRE; KLEIN, LUCINDA ON 07/19/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/19/2018 09:59:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/19/2018 09:59:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY DAVIS REALTY PARTNERS LLC ON 12/20/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY DAVIS REALTY PARTNERS LLC ON 12/20/2017

345 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY DAVIS REALTY PARTNERS LLC ON 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KLEIN, JEAN PIERRE ON 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2797622 RECEIVED ON 05/22/2019 04:01:42 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4945865 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 04/26/2019 08:45:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
544 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2616848 RECEIVED ON 11/29/2017 03:44:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/18/2018 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KLEIN, JEAN PIERRE; KLEIN, LUCINDA ON 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2608677 RECEIVED ON 11/02/2017 10:28:42 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 10/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234205 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057884.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KLEIN, JEAN PIERRE; KLEIN, LUCINDA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KLEIN, JEAN PIERRE; KLEIN, LUCINDA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY KLEIN, JEAN PIERRE; KLEIN, LUCINDA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2601159 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 04:19:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.