This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:21:50 (UTC).

JEAN KIRWAN VS COLTON KIRWAN

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JEAN KIRWAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against COLTON KIRWAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1688

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KIRWAN, JEAN JEREZA

Respondent

KIRWAN, COLTON LEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2017
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 03/06/2017; Filing Party: KIRWAN, JEAN JEREZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 03/06/2017; Filing Party: KIRWAN, JEAN JEREZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 03/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 03/03/2017; Filing Party: KIRWAN, JEAN JEREZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 03/03/2017; Filing Party: KIRWAN, JEAN JEREZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/03/2017; Filing Party: KIRWAN, JEAN JEREZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • RETURN SHEET - DEFAULT & JUDGMENT 10/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/20/2016; Filing Party: KIRWAN, COLTON LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • RETURN SHEET - DEFAULT & JUDGMENT 04/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/03/2016; Filing Party: KIRWAN, JEAN JEREZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/03/2016; Filing Party: KIRWAN, JEAN JEREZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/03/2016; Filing Party: KIRWAN, JEAN JEREZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: KIRWAN, JEAN JEREZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: KIRWAN, JEAN JEREZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: KIRWAN, JEAN JEREZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: KIRWAN, JEAN JEREZA

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.