This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/08/2019 at 06:48:34 (UTC).

JDS CONSULTING INC VS. SIMPLE RECOVERY, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/26/2019 JDS CONSULTING INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SIMPLE RECOVERY, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

JDS Consulting Inc

Defendants and Others

Stephen Odom

Simple Recovery, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Steven A. Fink

Defendant and Other Attorney

Alperstein, Simon, Farkas, Gillin & Scott, LLP

 

Court Documents

SURETY BOND FILED BY JDS CONSULTING INC ON 09/23/2019

SURETY BOND FILED BY JDS CONSULTING INC ON 09/23/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 495.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12621882 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12446361.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 495.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12621882 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12446361.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ODOM, STEPHEN; SIMPLE RECOVERY, LLC ON 09/16/2019

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ODOM, STEPHEN; SIMPLE RECOVERY, LLC ON 09/16/2019

MOTION TO STRIKE (PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT) FILED BY ODOM, STEPHEN; SIMPLE RECOVERY, LLC ON 09/16/2019

MOTION TO STRIKE (PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT) FILED BY ODOM, STEPHEN; SIMPLE RECOVERY, LLC ON 09/16/2019

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ODOM, STEPHEN; SIMPLE RECOVERY, LLC ON 09/16/2019

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ODOM, STEPHEN; SIMPLE RECOVERY, LLC ON 09/16/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12621875 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12446354.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12621875 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12446354.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SIMPLE RECOVERY, LLC ON 09/16/2019

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SIMPLE RECOVERY, LLC ON 09/16/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JDS CONSULTING INC ON 08/26/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JDS CONSULTING INC ON 08/26/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JDS CONSULTING INC ON 08/26/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JDS CONSULTING INC ON 08/26/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ODOM, STEPHEN FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 42.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12604931 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12429165.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ODOM, STEPHEN FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 42.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12604931 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12429165.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/05/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/05/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12599356 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12423513.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12599356 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12423513.

WRIT (ORANGE COUNTY) ISSUED ON 08/07/2019

WRIT (ORANGE COUNTY) ISSUED ON 08/07/2019

UNDERTAKING FILED BY JDS CONSULTING INC ON 08/02/2019

UNDERTAKING FILED BY JDS CONSULTING INC ON 08/02/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 08/02/2019 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 08/02/2019 08:30:00 AM.

RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AFTER HEARING AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FILED BY JDS CONSULTING INC ON 08/02/2019

RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AFTER HEARING AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FILED BY JDS CONSULTING INC ON 08/02/2019

TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED BY JDS CONSULTING INC ON 08/02/2019

TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED BY JDS CONSULTING INC ON 08/02/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12596568 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12420665.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12596568 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12420665.

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SURETY BOND FILED BY JDS CONSULTING INC ON 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT SCHEDULED FOR 10/21/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT SCHEDULED FOR 10/21/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 495.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12621882 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12446361.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ODOM, STEPHEN; SIMPLE RECOVERY, LLC ON 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO STRIKE (PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT) FILED BY ODOM, STEPHEN; SIMPLE RECOVERY, LLC ON 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ODOM, STEPHEN; SIMPLE RECOVERY, LLC ON 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3834747 RECEIVED ON 09/16/2019 12:22:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12621875 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12446354.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SIMPLE RECOVERY, LLC ON 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY JDS CONSULTING INC ON 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (RESIDENT) FILED BY JDS CONSULTING INC ON 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT) FILED BY JDS CONSULTING INC ON 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4997036 RECEIVED ON 08/01/2019 11:54:51 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BAUER, RONALD ON 07/26/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12594354 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12418413.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JDS CONSULTING INC ON 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JDS CONSULTING INC ON 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY JDS CONSULTING INC ON 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1648787 RECEIVED ON 07/26/2019 04:05:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less