This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:53:14 (UTC).

JAY KOWARSKY VS. OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JAY KOWARSKY filed an Other lawsuit against OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAY KOWARSKY

LYNDA KOWARSKY

Defendant

OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE FULLMAN FIRM, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

HINSHAW & CULBERTSON LLP

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 06/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 06/15/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12326476 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12150222.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12326476 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12150222.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927581 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751806.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927581 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751806.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES 04/04/2018 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES 04/04/2018 10:00:00 AM.

PROPOSED ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 04/12/2018

PROPOSED ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 04/12/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 03/01/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 03/01/2018

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 04/05/2018

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 04/05/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 02/26/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/01/2017 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/01/2017 08:45:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 06/08/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 06/08/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC ON 08/05/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC ON 08/05/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 04/05/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 04/05/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/09/2016 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/09/2016 08:45:00 AM.

OPPOSITION FILED BY OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC ON 03/21/2018

OPPOSITION FILED BY OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC ON 03/21/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 02/26/2016

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 04/05/2018

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 04/05/2018

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 03/01/2018

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 03/01/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12308985 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12132734.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12308985 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12132734.

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 04/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4816740 RECEIVED ON 02/16/2018 05:15:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 04/06/2018 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • THE ADR REVIEW HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR 07/18/2018 AT 08:45 AM IN DEPARTMENT C25.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • JURY TRIAL CONTINUED TO 08/27/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION. PLAINTIFF TO PAY THE CONTINUANC FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 08/24/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION. PLAINTIFF TO PAY THE CONTINUANCE FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • ADR REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/18/2018 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/27/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/24/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • EX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 04/06/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/14/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 06/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2469111 RECEIVED ON 06/08/2016 04:48:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927581 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751806.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY KOWARSKY, JAY; KOWARSKY, LYNDA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385189 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 11:50:29 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.