This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/10/2018 at 09:25:02 (UTC).

JAVIER VALENCIA - GUARDIANSHIP

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 JAVIER VALENCIA - GUARDIANSHIP was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Guardian Ad Litem

GEORGINA DE LA CRUZ

Minor

ALLISON I JAVIER VALENCIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2018
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 04/02/2018 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • (P) PETITION FOR SPECIAL IMMIGRANT JUVENILE FINDINGS CONTINUED TO 05/21/2018 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN CONTINUED TO 05/21/2018 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • (P) PETITION FOR SPECIAL IMMIGRANT JUVENILE FINDINGS SCHEDULED FOR 05/21/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C07 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN SCHEDULED FOR 05/21/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C07 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • NOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING FILED BY DE LA CRUZ, GEORGINA ON 03/14/2018; Filing Party: DE LA CRUZ, GEORGINA ON 03/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • LETTERS OF TEMPORARY GUARDIANSHIP OR CONSERVATORSHIP FILED BY DE LA CRUZ, GEORGINA ON 01/11/2018; Filing Party: DE LA CRUZ, GEORGINA ON 01/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN SCHEDULED FOR 04/02/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C07 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • (P) PETITION FOR SPECIAL IMMIGRANT JUVENILE FINDINGS CONTINUED TO 04/02/2018 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN CONTINUED TO 04/02/2018 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIAN SCREENING FORM FILED BY DE LA CRUZ, GEORGINA ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: DE LA CRUZ, GEORGINA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DUTIES OF GUARDIAN FILED BY DE LA CRUZ, GEORGINA ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: DE LA CRUZ, GEORGINA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CONSENT FILED BY DE LA CRUZ, GEORGINA ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: DE LA CRUZ, GEORGINA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CONSENT FILED BY DE LA CRUZ, GEORGINA ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: DE LA CRUZ, GEORGINA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) FILED BY DE LA CRUZ, GEORGINA ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: DE LA CRUZ, GEORGINA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DE LA CRUZ, GEORGINA REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 10/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN SCHEDULED FOR 01/08/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C07 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY DE LA CRUZ, GEORGINA ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: DE LA CRUZ, GEORGINA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF MINOR(S) FILED BY DE LA CRUZ, GEORGINA ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: DE LA CRUZ, GEORGINA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.