This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/25/2019 at 03:42:52 (UTC).

JASON STERN VS. JULIENS AUCTIONS

Case Summary

On 12/29/2014 JASON STERN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JULIENS AUCTIONS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JASON STERN

Defendant

JULIENS AUCTIONS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2015
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/09/2015 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH WAS VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY STERN, JASON ON 01/22/2015; Filing Party: STERN, JASON ON 01/22/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK FILED BY STERN, JASON ON 01/08/2015; Filing Party: STERN, JASON ON 01/08/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 03 - SMALL CLAIMS $1,500 OR LESS, 07 - CERTIFIED MAIL - SERVICE BY CLERK IN THE AMOUNT OF 45.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11712980 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11537243.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/09/2015 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY STERN, JASON ON 12/29/2014; Filing Party: STERN, JASON ON 12/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT FILED BY STERN, JASON ON 12/29/2014; Filing Party: STERN, JASON ON 12/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • CERTIFIED MAIL STATEMENT FILED BY STERN, JASON ON 12/29/2014; Filing Party: STERN, JASON ON 12/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Juliens Auctions LLC is a litigant