This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 06:46:31 (UTC).

JASON E. MURCHISON VS. DAVID P. ODDO

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 JASON E MURCHISON filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against DAVID P ODDO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason E. Murchison

Defendants

Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage Company

David Mac Leod

David P. Oddo

First American Title Insurance Company

Shoreline Development, Inc.

COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of William B. Hanley

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY MURCHISON, JASON E. ON 09/21/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MURCHISON, JASON E. ON 09/21/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MURCHISON, JASON E. ON 09/21/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MURCHISON, JASON E. ON 09/21/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MURCHISON, JASON E. ON 09/21/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MURCHISON, JASON E. ON 09/21/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12947425 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12775324.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12947425 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12775324.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/23/2022 AT 02:00:00 PM IN N15 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/23/2022 AT 02:00:00 PM IN N15 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MURCHISON, JASON E. ON 11/18/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MURCHISON, JASON E. ON 11/18/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SLAUGHTER; Department: N15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MURCHISON, JASON E. ON 11/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1919867 RECEIVED ON 11/18/2021 12:52:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/23/2022 AT 02:00:00 PM IN N15 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12947425 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12775324.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41243250 RECEIVED ON 09/21/2021 05:20:26 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SLAUGHTER, FRED ON 09/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MURCHISON, JASON E. ON 09/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MURCHISON, JASON E. ON 09/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MURCHISON, JASON E. ON 09/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where First American Title Insurance Company is a litigant