This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:29:25 (UTC).

JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST VS. MATTHEW ROBINSON

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MATTHEW ROBINSON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST

JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FA

Defendants

MATTHEW ROBINSON

MICHELLE BELL SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF STIRLING J. HOPSON

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 11/13/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 11/13/2017 09:00:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 10/26/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 10/26/2017

FAX CONFIRMATION

FAX CONFIRMATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 10/26/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 10/26/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 10/10/2017

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 10/31/2017

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 10/31/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 10/10/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3599866 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3599866 REJECTED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (PROPOSED) RECEIVED ON 11/09/2017.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (PROPOSED) RECEIVED ON 11/09/2017.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 12/04/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 12/04/2017

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) (FILED AND ENTERED 11/9/17) RECEIVED ON 11/09/2017.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) (FILED AND ENTERED 11/9/17) RECEIVED ON 11/09/2017.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 10/26/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 10/26/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12246148 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12069889.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12246148 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12069889.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 10/26/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 10/26/2017

WRIT (ISSUED 11/01/17) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED 11/01/17) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2017.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233677 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057357.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233677 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057357.

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 12/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • FAX CONFIRMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 11/13/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (STAYING EXECUTION) FILED BY ROBINSON, MATTHEW ON 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • ROBINSON, MATTHEW REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 11/09/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • EX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 11/13/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (PROPOSED) RECEIVED ON 11/09/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) (FILED AND ENTERED 11/9/17) RECEIVED ON 11/09/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ROBINSON, MATTHEW ON 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4781852 RECEIVED ON 10/26/2017 05:45:14 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3599866 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233677 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057357.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY JASON ABBOUD, TRUSTEE OF THE ABBOUD FAMILY TRUST ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1428939 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 10:44:37 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.