This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/27/2022 at 03:13:35 (UTC).

JARED TOLLER VS CONSTANCE NUNES

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 JARED TOLLER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CONSTANCE NUNES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2873

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TOLLER, JARED

Respondent

NUNES, CONSTANCE

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL 07/07/2021

RETURNED MAIL 07/07/2021

RETURNED MAIL 07/01/2021

RETURNED MAIL 07/01/2021

NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 06/24/2021

NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 06/24/2021

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 06/24/2021

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 06/24/2021

REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 05/28/2021

REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 05/28/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 05/28/2021 AMENDED

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 05/28/2021 AMENDED

RETURN SHEET - DEFAULT & JUDGMENT 05/12/2021

RETURN SHEET - DEFAULT & JUDGMENT 05/12/2021

DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 03/19/2021

DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 03/19/2021

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/19/2021 PRELIM

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/19/2021 PRELIM

RETURN SHEET - DEFAULT & JUDGMENT 04/09/2021

RETURN SHEET - DEFAULT & JUDGMENT 04/09/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 01/07/2021 INCOMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 01/07/2021 INCOMPLETE

NOTICE - CASE REVIEW 11/23/2020

NOTICE - CASE REVIEW 11/23/2020

NOTICE - RELATED CASE - UPDATE PARTY 06/08/2020

NOTICE - RELATED CASE - UPDATE PARTY 06/08/2020

PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 06/08/2020

PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 06/08/2020

SUMMONS 06/08/2020

SUMMONS 06/08/2020

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 06/08/2020 Amount:$435.00

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 06/08/2020 Amount:$435.00

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL 07/07/2021; Filing Party: NUNES, CONSTANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL 07/01/2021; Filing Party: TOLLER, JARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketJUDGMENT - DEFAULT 06/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 06/24/2021; Filing Party: TOLLER, JARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 06/24/2021; Filing Party: TOLLER, JARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 05/28/2021 AMENDED; Filing Party: TOLLER, JARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 05/28/2021; Filing Party: TOLLER, JARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN SHEET - DEFAULT & JUDGMENT 05/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN SHEET - DEFAULT & JUDGMENT 04/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/19/2021 PRELIM; Filing Party: TOLLER, JARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 03/19/2021; Filing Party: TOLLER, JARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 01/07/2021 INCOMPLETE; Filing Party: TOLLER, JARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - CASE REVIEW 11/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - DISSOLUTION 06/08/2020 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: TOLLER, JARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS 06/08/2020; Filing Party: TOLLER, JARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 06/08/2020; Filing Party: TOLLER, JARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE - UPDATE PARTY 06/08/2020; Filing Party: TOLLER, JARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less