This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/24/2019 at 05:45:16 (UTC).

JANKE V JANKE

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 JANKE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JANKE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1133

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roger Janke

Petitioner

JANKE, ROGER

Defendant

Linda Janke

Respondent

JANKE, LINDA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2013
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 09/20/2013 09:06:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: JANKE, ROGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • JUDGMENT 09/20/2013 09:06:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: JANKE, ROGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • STIPULATION - TEMPORARY JUDGE 09/20/2013 09:06:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • MINUTE ORDER 09/20/2013 08:15:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • JUDGMENT - DEFAULT 09/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • HRG - DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 07/22/2013 16:29:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: JANKE, ROGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/22/2013 09:03:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: JANKE, ROGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/22/2013 08:44:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: JANKE, ROGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • MEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 07/22/2013 11:07:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: JANKE, ROGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • CONFERENCE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • NOTICE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE 06/13/2013 10:23:00 GENERATED BY THE 100 - 120 DAY PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 04/05/2013 11:05:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: JANKE, ROGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 02/04/2013 09:42:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: JANKE, ROGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/04/2013 09:42:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: JANKE, ROGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • SUMMONS 02/04/2013 09:42:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: JANKE, ROGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/04/2013 09:41:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: JANKE, ROGER

    Read MoreRead Less