This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/06/2020 at 19:02:15 (UTC).

JANICE SHELDON VS. LINDSEY UEBERROTH

Case Summary

On 11/25/2015 JANICE SHELDON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LINDSEY UEBERROTH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANICE SHELDON

Defendants

LINDSEY UEBERROTH

Raj S. Singh

Preferred Hotel Group, Inc.

John Ueberroth

Gail L. Ueberroth as Trustee of the J. and G. Ueberroth Revocable Trust dated April 26, 2006.

John A. Ueberroth as Trustee of the J. and G. Ueberroth Revocable Trust dated April 26, 2006

John Ueberroth as Trustee of the J. and G. Ueberroth Revocable Trust dated April 26, 2006.

Gail L. Ueberroth

John A. Ueberroth

Preferred Hotel Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JAIN LAW GROUP

Smith Hall Strongin, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

DANIELS, FINE, ISRAEL, SCHONBUCH & LEBOVITS

Daniels, Fine, Israel, Schonbuch & Lebovits, LLP

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY UEBERROTH, GAIL L.; UEBERROTH, JOHN; UEBERROTH, JOHN A.; UEBERROTH, LINDSEY; PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP ON 01/24/2020

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY UEBERROTH, GAIL L.; UEBERROTH, JOHN; UEBERROTH, JOHN A.; UEBERROTH, LINDSEY; PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP ON 01/24/2020

OPPOSITION FILED BY UEBERROTH, GAIL L.; UEBERROTH, JOHN; UEBERROTH, JOHN A.; UEBERROTH, LINDSEY; PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP ON 01/24/2020

OPPOSITION FILED BY UEBERROTH, GAIL L.; UEBERROTH, JOHN; UEBERROTH, JOHN A.; UEBERROTH, LINDSEY; PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP ON 01/24/2020

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY SHELDON, JANICE ON 01/06/2020

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY SHELDON, JANICE ON 01/06/2020

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SHELDON, JANICE ON 01/06/2020

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SHELDON, JANICE ON 01/06/2020

MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS FILED BY SHELDON, JANICE ON 01/06/2020

MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS FILED BY SHELDON, JANICE ON 01/06/2020

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/06/2020

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/06/2020

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY UEBERROTH, GAIL L.; UEBERROTH, JOHN; UEBERROTH, LINDSEY; PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP ON 12/17/2019

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY UEBERROTH, GAIL L.; UEBERROTH, JOHN; UEBERROTH, LINDSEY; PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP ON 12/17/2019

JUDGMENT FILED BY UEBERROTH, JOHN; UEBERROTH, LINDSEY; UEBERROTH, GAIL L. ON 12/04/2019

JUDGMENT FILED BY UEBERROTH, JOHN; UEBERROTH, LINDSEY; UEBERROTH, GAIL L. ON 12/04/2019

TRIAL DOCS

TRIAL DOCS

OPPOSITION (SUPPLEMENTAL OPP TO MIL NO.1) FILED BY UEBERROTH, GAIL L.; UEBERROTH, LINDSEY; UEBERROTH, JOHN; PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP ON 10/25/2019

OPPOSITION (SUPPLEMENTAL OPP TO MIL NO.1) FILED BY UEBERROTH, GAIL L.; UEBERROTH, LINDSEY; UEBERROTH, JOHN; PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP ON 10/25/2019

TRIAL DOCS

TRIAL DOCS

EXHIBIT LIST (JOINT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/30/2019

EXHIBIT LIST (JOINT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/30/2019

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/14/2019.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/14/2019.

STIPULATION

STIPULATION

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 2019-10-31 08:30:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 2019-10-31 08:30:00.0.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2850058 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2850058 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY USA LEGAL NETWORK WORLDWIDE LEGAL GROUP FOR 227 - SUBSEQUENT JURY TRIAL FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF 130.33, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12652575 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12477158.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY USA LEGAL NETWORK WORLDWIDE LEGAL GROUP FOR 227 - SUBSEQUENT JURY TRIAL FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF 130.33, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12652575 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12477158.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AAA ATTORNEY SERVICES FOR 227 - SUBSEQUENT JURY TRIAL FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF 130.33, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12652361 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12476944.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AAA ATTORNEY SERVICES FOR 227 - SUBSEQUENT JURY TRIAL FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF 130.33, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12652361 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12476944.

322 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS; Judge: SALTER; Department: C22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY UEBERROTH, GAIL L.; UEBERROTH, JOHN; UEBERROTH, JOHN A.; UEBERROTH, LINDSEY; PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP ON 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPPOSITION FILED BY UEBERROTH, GAIL L.; UEBERROTH, JOHN; UEBERROTH, JOHN A.; UEBERROTH, LINDSEY; PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP ON 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3880801 RECEIVED ON 01/24/2020 03:02:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS SCHEDULED FOR 02/06/2020 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3873681 RECEIVED ON 01/06/2020 09:28:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY SHELDON, JANICE ON 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SHELDON, JANICE ON 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS FILED BY SHELDON, JANICE ON 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
499 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/28/2016 08:45:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 05/23/2016 AT 08:45 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/23/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/28/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • DocketSHELDON, JANICE REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 11/25/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY SHELDON, JANICE ON 11/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHULTE, MARY ON 11/25/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SHELDON, JANICE ON 11/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SHELDON, JANICE ON 11/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gail L. Ueberroth as Trustee of the J. and G. Ueberroth Revocable Trust dated April 26, 2006. is a litigant

Latest cases where PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP INC is a litigant