This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/27/2019 at 10:04:05 (UTC).

JANET PRICHARD VS. BAYER CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/04/2015 JANET PRICHARD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BAYER CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANET PRICHARD

Defendants

BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC

NEWPORT FAMILY MEDICINE, INC.

BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AG

A MEDICAL GROUP

BAYER AG

BAYER CORPORATION

KRISTI HENNAN, M.D

BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION

BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MADISON HARBOR, ALC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - OTHER (RECEIPT FOR RECORDS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/22/2016

NOTICE - OTHER (RECEIPT FOR RECORDS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/22/2016

CASE FILE CONTENTS TRANSFERRED TO RECEIVING COURT LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER. .

CASE FILE CONTENTS TRANSFERRED TO RECEIVING COURT LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER. .

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1300493 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1300493 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1300494 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1300494 REJECTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/20/2016 03:29:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/20/2016 03:29:00 PM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1300492 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1300492 REJECTED.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/20/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/20/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/20/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/20/2016

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ENTRY OF ORDER COORDINATING CASE) FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET; BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. ON 01/07/2016

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ENTRY OF ORDER COORDINATING CASE) FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET; BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. ON 01/07/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 01/04/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 01/04/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 12/31/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 12/31/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 12/31/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 12/31/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 12/22/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 12/22/2015

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 12/04/2015

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 12/04/2015

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 12/04/2015

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 12/04/2015

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 12/04/2015

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 12/04/2015

COMPLAINT FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 12/04/2015

COMPLAINT FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 12/04/2015

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (RECEIPT FOR RECORDS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE FILE CONTENTS TRANSFERRED TO RECEIVING COURT LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (OF TRANSFER) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1300493 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1300494 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/20/2016 03:29:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • THE COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER BE TRANSFERRED TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT UPON PAYMENT OF ALL THE NECESSARY FEES REQUIRED BY LAW. THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IS AUTHORIZED TO TRANSFER ALL THE PLEADINGS AND PAPERS TO THE CLERK OF THE RECEIVING COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1300492 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/20/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 12/22/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 12/22/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1296365 RECEIVED ON 12/22/2015 11:01:38 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DUNNING, KIM ON 12/04/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11888098 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11712291.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 12/04/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 12/04/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 12/04/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY PRICHARD, JANET ON 12/04/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4472750 RECEIVED ON 12/04/2015 01:32:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A MEDICAL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Bayer Corporation is a litigant