This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 05:12:56 (UTC).

JANE DOE VS. MONTAGE LAGUNA BEACH, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 JANE DOE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MONTAGE LAGUNA BEACH, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jane Doe

Defendants

Kris Espinoza

Montage Hotels & Resorts, LLC

Montage Laguna Beach, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dordick Law Corporation

Defendant Attorney

Tyson & Mendes, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/05/2022 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/05/2022 01:30:00 PM.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DOE, JANE ON 12/05/2022

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DOE, JANE ON 12/05/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DOE, JANE ON 11/17/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DOE, JANE ON 11/17/2022

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/03/2022 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/03/2022 01:30:00 PM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC; MONTAGE LAGUNA BEACH, LLC ON 09/19/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC; MONTAGE LAGUNA BEACH, LLC ON 09/19/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DOE, JANE ON 09/16/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DOE, JANE ON 09/16/2022

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/10/2022 02:32:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/10/2022 02:32:00 PM.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DOE, JANE ON 08/04/2022

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DOE, JANE ON 08/04/2022

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 07/29/2022

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 07/29/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/29/2022 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/29/2022 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13084611 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12912601.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13084611 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12912601.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC; MONTAGE LAGUNA BEACH, LLC ON 07/28/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC; MONTAGE LAGUNA BEACH, LLC ON 07/28/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC; MONTAGE LAGUNA BEACH, LLC ON 07/28/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC; MONTAGE LAGUNA BEACH, LLC ON 07/28/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13076158 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12904160.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13076158 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12904160.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DOE, JANE ON 07/11/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DOE, JANE ON 07/11/2022

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MARKS; Department: CX102

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELOCATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/05/2022 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 02/06/2023 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DOE, JANE ON 12/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41419153 RECEIVED ON 12/05/2022 05:06:54 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DOE, JANE ON 11/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41412706 RECEIVED ON 11/17/2022 05:24:07 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/03/2022 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY DOE, JANE ON 04/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21146827 RECEIVED ON 04/14/2022 11:13:43 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DOE, JANE ON 03/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41307955 RECEIVED ON 03/10/2022 11:24:46 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/29/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 02/28/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13013952 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12841882.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DOE, JANE ON 02/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY DOE, JANE ON 02/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21127852 RECEIVED ON 02/28/2022 01:11:53 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONTAGE LAGUNA BEACH, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS LLC is a litigant