This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/12/2019 at 08:19:56 (UTC).

JAMES REISING VS. INTER-INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB

Case Summary

On 07/17/2018 JAMES REISING filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INTER-INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES REISING

Defendants

AUTOMOBILE CLUB OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

AUTO CLUB

INTER-INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB

AAA INSURANCE

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB

INTER-INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMO

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY J. DONAHUE

Defendant Attorney

MANDELL, DAMON & ASSOCIATES, LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY REISING, JAMES ON 02/08/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY REISING, JAMES ON 02/08/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2757067 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2757067 REJECTED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 01/28/2019 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 01/28/2019 08:30:00 AM.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB ON 09/26/2018

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB ON 09/26/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12419030 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12242730.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12419030 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12242730.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (FOR STAY) FILED BY INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB ON 09/14/2018

STIPULATION AND ORDER (FOR STAY) FILED BY INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB ON 09/14/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/11/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/11/2018

STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/28/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/28/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY REISING, JAMES ON 08/13/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY REISING, JAMES ON 08/13/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY REISING, JAMES ON 08/13/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY REISING, JAMES ON 08/13/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY REISING, JAMES ON 07/19/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY REISING, JAMES ON 07/19/2018

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 07/17/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 07/17/2018.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12386045 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12209767.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12386045 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12209767.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY REISING, JAMES ON 07/17/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY REISING, JAMES ON 07/17/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY REISING, JAMES ON 07/17/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY REISING, JAMES ON 07/17/2018

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY REISING, JAMES ON 02/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3757941 RECEIVED ON 02/08/2019 12:22:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2757067 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 01/28/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • THE ADR REVIEW HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR 09/23/2019 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • ADR REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/23/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB ON 09/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3713296 RECEIVED ON 09/26/2018 03:23:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY REISING, JAMES ON 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY REISING, JAMES ON 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2701119 RECEIVED ON 08/13/2018 10:43:42 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY REISING, JAMES ON 07/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3689760 RECEIVED ON 07/19/2018 01:18:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 07/17/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12386045 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12209767.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY REISING, JAMES ON 07/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY REISING, JAMES ON 07/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3688877 RECEIVED ON 07/17/2018 03:16:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto Club Enterprises is a litigant

Latest cases where INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases where AAA INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where Automobile Club of Southern California is a litigant