This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/18/2018 at 05:25:25 (UTC).

JAMES N. BELL VS. SHAWN WARREN

Case Summary

On 08/04/2016 JAMES N BELL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SHAWN WARREN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

JAMES N. BELL

Defendants and Appellants

CAMI WARREN

SHAWN WARREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

THE DURINGER LAW GROUP PLC.

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

BROWN MCCLAIN, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISPOSE OF EXHIBITS FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/28/2017

NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISPOSE OF EXHIBITS FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/28/2017

NOTICE - OTHER (INTENT TO DISPOSE OF EXHIBITS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/28/2017

NOTICE - OTHER (INTENT TO DISPOSE OF EXHIBITS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/28/2017

REMITTITUR FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/09/2016

REMITTITUR FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/09/2016

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS-APPELLATE DIVISION CASE 2016-00881923

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS-APPELLATE DIVISION CASE 2016-00881923

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 191 - APPEAL - LIMITED CASES WHERE AMOUNT DEMANDED <= $10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12047644 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11871589.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 191 - APPEAL - LIMITED CASES WHERE AMOUNT DEMANDED <= $10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12047644 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11871589.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY WARREN, CAMI; WARREN, SHAWN ON 10/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY WARREN, CAMI; WARREN, SHAWN ON 10/17/2016

NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED

NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY BELL, JAMES N. ON 09/27/2016

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY BELL, JAMES N. ON 09/27/2016

OBJECTION FILED BY WARREN, CAMI; WARREN, SHAWN ON 09/26/2016

OBJECTION FILED BY WARREN, CAMI; WARREN, SHAWN ON 09/26/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 09/20/2016 11:03:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 09/20/2016 11:03:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 09/20/2016 11:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 09/20/2016 11:00:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY BELL, JAMES N. ON 08/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY BELL, JAMES N. ON 08/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BELL, JAMES N. ON 08/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BELL, JAMES N. ON 08/17/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K, 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 450.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12014994 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11839059.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K, 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 450.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12014994 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11839059.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BELL, JAMES N. ON 08/04/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BELL, JAMES N. ON 08/04/2016

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISPOSE OF EXHIBITS FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (INTENT TO DISPOSE OF EXHIBITS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/09/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY BELL, JAMES N. ON 11/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4638636 RECEIVED ON 11/21/2016 04:22:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER (STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS APPEAL, VACATE JUDGMENT AND DISMISS CASE WITH PREJUDICE) FILED BY BELL, JAMES N. ON 11/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL RECEIVED ON 10/31/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4628612 RECEIVED ON 10/31/2016 02:21:18 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K, 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 450.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12014994 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11839059.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY WARREN, CAMI; WARREN, SHAWN ON 08/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WARREN, CAMI; WARREN, SHAWN ON 08/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2485795 RECEIVED ON 08/15/2016 03:08:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12010186 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11834260.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BELL, JAMES N. ON 08/04/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BELL, JAMES N. ON 08/04/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY BELL, JAMES N. ON 08/04/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1336338 RECEIVED ON 08/04/2016 04:32:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less