This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/18/2021 at 07:48:34 (UTC).

JAMES KRONENBITTER VS. DS SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 JAMES KRONENBITTER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DS SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Kronenbitter

Defendants

DS Services of America, Inc.

Daniel Arruda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sottile Baltaxe

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY KRONENBITTER, JAMES ON 10/25/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY KRONENBITTER, JAMES ON 10/25/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KRONENBITTER, JAMES ON 10/25/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KRONENBITTER, JAMES ON 10/25/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KRONENBITTER, JAMES ON 10/25/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KRONENBITTER, JAMES ON 10/25/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12962021 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12789944.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12962021 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12789944.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY KRONENBITTER, JAMES ON 11/09/2021

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY KRONENBITTER, JAMES ON 11/09/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GOODING; Department: C32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY KRONENBITTER, JAMES ON 11/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41262632 RECEIVED ON 11/09/2021 03:49:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12962021 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12789944.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1909782 RECEIVED ON 10/25/2021 12:03:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GOODING, MARTHA ON 10/25/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KRONENBITTER, JAMES ON 10/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KRONENBITTER, JAMES ON 10/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY KRONENBITTER, JAMES ON 10/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DS SERVICES OF AMERICA INC. (DOE 2) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOTTILE * BALTAXE