Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/17/2021 at 20:06:54 (UTC).

JAMES CORRALES VS. AARON O'REILLY

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 JAMES CORRALES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AARON O'REILLY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES CORRALES

Defendants

JAKE HUISH

COLIN MCLAUGHLIN

AARON O'REILLY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • HearingDescription: SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Department: VCC5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/07/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY CORRALES, JAMES ON 03/29/2021; Filing Party: CORRALES, JAMES ON 03/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY CORRALES, JAMES D FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12840273 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12667792.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/12/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY CORRALES, JAMES ON 02/02/2021; Filing Party: CORRALES, JAMES ON 02/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less