This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2019 at 03:03:18 (UTC).

JAMES CHRISTIAN RICE VS. PORT MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JAMES CHRISTIAN RICE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PORT MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES CHRISTIAN RICE

Defendants

PORT MEDICAL SAN PEDRO, INC.

CHRIS VIRAMONTES

DAVID GOMEZ

SERGIO AMADOR

PORT MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHAFFEY LAW GROUP, PC

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF WARREN M. STANTON

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY GOMEZ, DAVID; VIRAMONTES, CHRIS ON 02/23/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY GOMEZ, DAVID; VIRAMONTES, CHRIS ON 02/23/2017

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/01/2017.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/01/2017.

COMPLAINT FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 02/26/2016

STATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 03/22/2017

STATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 03/22/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 09/19/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 09/19/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GOMEZ, DAVID ON 05/19/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GOMEZ, DAVID ON 05/19/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11974562 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11798722.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11974562 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11798722.

TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY GOMEZ, DAVID ON 07/31/2017

TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY GOMEZ, DAVID ON 07/31/2017

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 02/26/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RICE, JAMES FOR 22 - COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES: COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES FOR CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING MORE THAN 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 125.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12195479 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12019179.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RICE, JAMES FOR 22 - COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES: COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES FOR CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING MORE THAN 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 125.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12195479 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12019179.

NOTICE - OTHER (TO COUNSEL RE: REPORTER PER DIEM AND JURY FEES) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/31/2017

NOTICE - OTHER (TO COUNSEL RE: REPORTER PER DIEM AND JURY FEES) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/31/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LAW OFFICES OF WARREN M. STANTON FOR 22 - COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES: COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES FOR CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING MORE THAN 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 125.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12195730 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12019442.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LAW OFFICES OF WARREN M. STANTON FOR 22 - COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES: COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES FOR CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING MORE THAN 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 125.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12195730 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12019442.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 02/29/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 02/29/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 09/07/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 09/07/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 04/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 04/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GOMEZ, DAVID; VIRAMONTES, CHRIS ON 09/23/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GOMEZ, DAVID; VIRAMONTES, CHRIS ON 09/23/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 10/04/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 10/04/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 02/26/2016

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1422031 RECEIVED ON 09/19/2017 12:32:37 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3580501 RECEIVED ON 08/24/2017 01:12:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/01/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1406279 RECEIVED ON 08/01/2017 02:42:44 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 04/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4538254 RECEIVED ON 04/26/2016 09:36:44 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/01/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 02/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2447007 RECEIVED ON 02/29/2016 12:10:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927599 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751824.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY RICE, JAMES CHRISTIAN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385162 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 11:21:03 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less