This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/19/2018 at 06:59:33 (UTC).

JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. VS. RAYMOND DAVID HENDRICKSON

Case Summary

On 10/07/2016 JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RAYMOND DAVID HENDRICKSON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P.

Defendant

RAYMOND DAVID HENDRICKSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

Defendant Attorney

LEGAL AID SOCIETY OF ORANGE COUNTY

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. ON 01/05/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. ON 01/05/2017

STIPULATION - OTHER (FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. ON 11/16/2016

STIPULATION - OTHER (FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. ON 11/16/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/16/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/16/2016 09:00:00 AM.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY HENDRICKSON, RAYMOND DAVID ON 11/01/2016

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY HENDRICKSON, RAYMOND DAVID ON 11/01/2016

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/16/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/16/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. ON 10/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. ON 10/26/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. ON 10/26/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. ON 10/26/2016

AMENDED ANSWER FILED BY HENDRICKSON, RAYMOND DAVID ON 10/24/2016

AMENDED ANSWER FILED BY HENDRICKSON, RAYMOND DAVID ON 10/24/2016

APPLICATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. ON 10/19/2016

APPLICATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. ON 10/19/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/20/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/20/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HENDRICKSON, RAYMOND DAVID ON 10/20/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HENDRICKSON, RAYMOND DAVID ON 10/20/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12047346 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11871291.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12047346 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11871291.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/17/2016.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/17/2016.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12042956 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11866921.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12042956 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11866921.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. ON 10/07/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. ON 10/07/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. ON 10/07/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. ON 10/07/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. ON 10/07/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. ON 10/07/2016

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. ON 01/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4657883 RECEIVED ON 01/05/2017 02:54:03 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION - OTHER (FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. ON 11/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/16/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/23/2017 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT H10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 01/23/2017 AT 01:30:00 PM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY HENDRICKSON, RAYMOND DAVID ON 11/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4629349 RECEIVED ON 11/01/2016 03:27:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HENDRICKSON, RAYMOND DAVID ON 10/20/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12047346 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11871291.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/17/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2502116 RECEIVED ON 10/17/2016 03:34:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12042956 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11866921.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. ON 10/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. ON 10/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING, L.P. ON 10/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1347806 RECEIVED ON 10/07/2016 11:52:25 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less