This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/27/2017 at 06:49:37 (UTC).

JAIME GONZALEZ VS. IRVINE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/26/2013 JAIME GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IRVINE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAIME GONZALEZ

Defendants

IRVINE COMPANY

PACIFIC ARTS PLAZA

IRVINE COMPANY OFFICE

THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC

CUESTA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

Cross Defendant

CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC

Other and Defendant

THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTABLIN & BRUCE, A LAW PARTNERSHIP

Other and Defendant Attorney

WOOD, SMITH, HENNING & BERMAN LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GONZALEZ, JAIME ON 06/03/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GONZALEZ, JAIME ON 06/03/2014

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/28/2014 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/28/2014 08:45:00 AM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4192100 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4192100 REJECTED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 04/15/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 04/15/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 04/11/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 04/11/2014

CASE REASSIGNED TO MARY SCHULTE EFFECTIVE 05/05/2014.

CASE REASSIGNED TO MARY SCHULTE EFFECTIVE 05/05/2014.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 03/21/2014

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 03/21/2014

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (CROSS COMPLAINT) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 03/21/2014

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (CROSS COMPLAINT) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 03/21/2014

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/12/2014 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/12/2014 09:30:00 AM.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 41) FILED BY GONZALEZ, JAIME ON 03/11/2014

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 41) FILED BY GONZALEZ, JAIME ON 03/11/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE), 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11552540 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11376448.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE), 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11552540 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11376448.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 02/28/2014

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 02/28/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 02/28/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 02/28/2014

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 02/28/2014

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 02/28/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GONZALEZ, JAIME ON 02/25/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GONZALEZ, JAIME ON 02/25/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GONZALEZ, JAIME ON 02/25/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GONZALEZ, JAIME ON 02/25/2014

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GONZALEZ, JAIME ON 02/06/2014

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GONZALEZ, JAIME ON 02/06/2014

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2014
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GONZALEZ, JAIME ON 06/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4198810 RECEIVED ON 06/03/2014 12:04:10 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/28/2014 08:45:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • DocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED IS SCHEDULED FOR 06/25/2014 AT 08:45 AM IN DEPARTMENT C06.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED SCHEDULED FOR 06/25/2014 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C06 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4192100 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2312954 RECEIVED ON 02/25/2014 04:05:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GONZALEZ, JAIME ON 02/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3111638 RECEIVED ON 02/06/2014 03:28:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/12/2014 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C06 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER RODRIGUEZ, LUIS ON 11/26/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11503489 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11327274.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GONZALEZ, JAIME ON 11/26/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GONZALEZ, JAIME ON 11/26/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY GONZALEZ, JAIME ON 11/26/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1128260 RECEIVED ON 11/26/2013 09:44:49 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CUESTA CONSTRUCTION CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Irvine Company, LLC is a litigant