This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:22:49 (UTC).

JAIMA MACIAS VS ENRICO MACIAS

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JAIMA MACIAS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ENRICO MACIAS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILSON, RENEE E.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1668

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILSON, RENEE E.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MACIAS, JAIMA

Respondent

MACIAS, ENRICO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ZILKO, DIANA KAYE

Respondent Attorney

WEINER, JULIA D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • TRIAL - LONG CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • NOTICE - JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT 12/12/2018 H13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 10/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • TRIAL - LONG CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - BRIEF / STATEMENT 07/17/2018; Filing Party: MACIAS, ENRICO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 07/17/2018; Filing Party: MACIAS, ENRICO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 07/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • CONFERENCE - MANDATORY SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - BRIEF / STATEMENT 07/11/2018 Settlement Conference - Brief / Statement; Filing Party: MACIAS, JAIMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2016
  • NOTICE - CHANGE OF ADDRESS 10/17/2016; Filing Party: MACIAS, JAIMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 04/07/2016; Filing Party: MACIAS, ENRICO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 04/07/2016; Filing Party: MACIAS, ENRICO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 04/07/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: MACIAS, ENRICO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/01/2016 Preliminary; Filing Party: MACIAS, JAIMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 04/01/2016; Filing Party: MACIAS, JAIMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MACIAS, JAIMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MACIAS, JAIMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MACIAS, JAIMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: MACIAS, JAIMA

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.