This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:28:52 (UTC).

JAECHOL YOON VS. LAWRENCE YOO

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JAECHOL YOON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LAWRENCE YOO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAECHOL YOON

Defendant

LAWRENCE YOO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER MEDIATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY YOON, JAECHOL ON 06/06/2016; Filing Party: YOON, JAECHOL ON 06/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • MEDIATION WAS SUCCESSFUL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 06/06/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/06/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL REASSIGNED TO C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 06/06/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL CONTINUED TO 06/06/2016 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C04.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/02/2016 02:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/06/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY YOON, JAECHOL ON 05/19/2016; Filing Party: YOON, JAECHOL ON 05/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY YANG, DONALD J FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927196 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751421.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/06/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY YOON, JAECHOL ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: YOON, JAECHOL ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.