This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/26/2022 at 07:02:02 (UTC).

JADA HILL VS. WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS U.S., INC.

Case Summary

On 12/14/2021 JADA HILL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS U S , INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jada Hill

Defendants

The Walt Disney Company

Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Johnson Attorneys Group

Defendant Attorney

Snell & Wilmer L.L.P

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY HILL, JADA ON 12/14/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY HILL, JADA ON 12/14/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HILL, JADA ON 12/14/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HILL, JADA ON 12/14/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HILL, JADA ON 12/14/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HILL, JADA ON 12/14/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12982875 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12810796.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12982875 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12810796.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/05/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/05/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY HILL, JADA ON 01/13/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY HILL, JADA ON 01/13/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY HILL, JADA ON 01/13/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY HILL, JADA ON 01/13/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY HILL, JADA ON 01/20/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY HILL, JADA ON 01/20/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY HILL, JADA ON 02/07/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY HILL, JADA ON 02/07/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS U.S., INC. ON 02/17/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS U.S., INC. ON 02/17/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13009899 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12837867.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13009899 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12837867.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS U.S., INC. ON 02/17/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS U.S., INC. ON 02/17/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13010215 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12838183.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13010215 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12838183.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MARKS; Department: C25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13010215 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12838183.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1953181 RECEIVED ON 02/17/2022 10:38:35 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13009899 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12837867.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41299501 RECEIVED ON 02/17/2022 10:44:59 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS U.S., INC. ON 02/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS U.S., INC. ON 02/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY HILL, JADA ON 02/07/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31117234 RECEIVED ON 02/07/2022 03:11:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY HILL, JADA ON 01/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31107708 RECEIVED ON 01/13/2022 05:09:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY HILL, JADA ON 01/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41285704 RECEIVED ON 01/13/2022 05:09:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/05/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12982875 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12810796.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41275173 RECEIVED ON 12/14/2021 12:53:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 12/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HILL, JADA ON 12/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HILL, JADA ON 12/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY HILL, JADA ON 12/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALT DISNEY COMPANY THE is a litigant