This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:26:21 (UTC).

JACQUELYN PASTORE VS. ASHLEY VIAFARA

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 JACQUELYN PASTORE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ASHLEY VIAFARA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACQUELYN PASTORE

Defendant

ASHLEY VIAFARA

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 11/03/2017

JUDGMENT FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 11/03/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 11/17/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 11/17/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 10/10/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 10/12/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 10/12/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/02/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/02/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 11/02/2017 03:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 11/02/2017 03:30:00 PM.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY VIAFARA, ASHLEY ON 10/13/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY VIAFARA, ASHLEY ON 10/13/2017

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/10/2017

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/10/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 11/03/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 11/03/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 10/10/2017

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 10/16/2017

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 10/16/2017

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/13/2017

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/13/2017

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 10/10/2017

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/02/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/02/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 11/02/2017 03:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER DATED 11/2/17 CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/02/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • POSSESSION OF THE FOLLOWING PROPERTY: 19652 MONTEANO LANE (BACK ROOM ON THE LEFT) YORBA LINDA, CA 92886 IS AWARDED TO PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY VIAFARA, ASHLEY ON 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY VIAFARA, ASHLEY ON 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PASTORE, JACQUELYN REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 10/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY PASTORE, JACQUELYN ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.