This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/08/2022 at 07:30:08 (UTC).

JACKIE PETERSON VS. ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/24/2022 JACKIE PETERSON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jackie Peterson

Defendants

Alta Hospitals System, LLC

Alta Newport Hospital, Inc.

Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Optimum Employment Lawyers

Defendant Attorney

Rutan & Tucker, LLP

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC; ALTA NEWPORT HOSPITAL, INC.; PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 03/11/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC; ALTA NEWPORT HOSPITAL, INC.; PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 03/11/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/11/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/11/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC; ALTA NEWPORT HOSPITAL, INC.; PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 03/11/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC; ALTA NEWPORT HOSPITAL, INC.; PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 03/11/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13019835 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12847782.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13019835 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12847782.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/16/2022 07:36:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/16/2022 07:36:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC; ALTA NEWPORT HOSPITAL, INC.; PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 03/16/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC; ALTA NEWPORT HOSPITAL, INC.; PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 03/16/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13021424 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12849403.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13021424 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12849403.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/28/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/28/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC; ALTA NEWPORT HOSPITAL, INC.; PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 03/28/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC; ALTA NEWPORT HOSPITAL, INC.; PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 03/28/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/01/2022 07:42:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/01/2022 07:42:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC; ALTA NEWPORT HOSPITAL, INC.; PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 04/05/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC; ALTA NEWPORT HOSPITAL, INC.; PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 04/05/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13030191 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12858188.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13030191 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12858188.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY PETERSON, JACKIE ON 01/27/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY PETERSON, JACKIE ON 01/27/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY PETERSON, JACKIE ON 01/27/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY PETERSON, JACKIE ON 01/27/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY PETERSON, JACKIE ON 01/26/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY PETERSON, JACKIE ON 01/26/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SCHWARM; Department: W08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41315112 RECEIVED ON 03/28/2022 02:08:24 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC; ALTA NEWPORT HOSPITAL, INC.; PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 04/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13030191 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12858188.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/01/2022 07:42:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1968834 RECEIVED ON 03/28/2022 02:08:18 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC; ALTA NEWPORT HOSPITAL, INC.; PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 03/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/16/2022 07:36:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY PETERSON, JACKIE ON 01/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41290666 RECEIVED ON 01/26/2022 02:52:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY PETERSON, JACKIE ON 01/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41289390 RECEIVED ON 01/24/2022 01:39:42 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12998518 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12826437.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PETERSON, JACKIE ON 01/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PETERSON, JACKIE ON 01/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PETERSON, JACKIE ON 01/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 01/24/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant