This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/11/2022 at 07:28:51 (UTC).

J. S. VS. ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 J S filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J. S.

Defendants

ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE

ST. CALLISTUS CATHOLIC CHURCH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Herman Law

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY S., J. ON 11/29/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY S., J. ON 11/29/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY S., J. ON 11/29/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY S., J. ON 11/29/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12976143 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12804062.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12976143 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12804062.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/28/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/28/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY S., J. ON 11/30/2021

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY S., J. ON 11/30/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY S., J. ON 11/30/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY S., J. ON 11/30/2021

CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS FILED BY S., J. ON 11/30/2021

CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS FILED BY S., J. ON 11/30/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY S., J. ON 11/30/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY S., J. ON 11/30/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12977366 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12805285.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12977366 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12805285.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY S., J. ON 12/08/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY S., J. ON 12/08/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY S., J. ON 12/08/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY S., J. ON 12/08/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HOFFER; Department: C42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY S., J. ON 12/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21097857 RECEIVED ON 12/08/2021 03:47:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY S., J. ON 12/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31094800 RECEIVED ON 12/08/2021 09:31:12 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12977366 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12805285.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1923360 RECEIVED ON 11/30/2021 01:19:26 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY S., J. ON 11/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS FILED BY S., J. ON 11/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY S., J. ON 11/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY S., J. ON 11/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/28/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12976143 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12804062.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21093630 RECEIVED ON 11/29/2021 11:43:53 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 11/29/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY S., J. ON 11/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY S., J. ON 11/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOOP OF ORANGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Herman Law