This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/23/2023 at 13:56:14 (UTC).

J K VS. DOE 1

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 J K filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DOE 1. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J K

Defendants

DOE 1

DOE 2

DOE 3

Archdiocese of Los Angeles

St. Anthony Claret Catholic Church

The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Herman Law

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/24/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/24/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13114809 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12942848.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13114809 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12942848.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY K, J ON 09/27/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY K, J ON 09/27/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY K, J ON 09/27/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY K, J ON 09/27/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY K, J ON 09/27/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY K, J ON 09/27/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/09/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/09/2022

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY K, J ON 12/09/2022

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY K, J ON 12/09/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY K, J ON 12/09/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY K, J ON 12/09/2022

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY K, J ON 12/09/2022

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY K, J ON 12/09/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13149145 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12977242.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13149145 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12977242.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 12/13/2022 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 12/13/2022 01:30:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/13/2022

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/13/2022

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY K, J ON 12/22/2022

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY K, J ON 12/22/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY K, J ON 12/22/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY K, J ON 12/22/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY K, J ON 01/09/2023

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY K, J ON 01/09/2023

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SERVINO; Department: C21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31253471 RECEIVED ON 01/08/2023 04:00:47 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY K, J ON 01/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11080644 RECEIVED ON 12/22/2022 05:09:04 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY K, J ON 12/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY K, J ON 12/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11075219 RECEIVED ON 12/09/2022 04:08:05 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 12/13/2022 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY K, J ON 12/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21245756 RECEIVED ON 12/09/2022 04:08:05 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/24/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13114809 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12942848.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31212121 RECEIVED ON 09/27/2022 04:25:39 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 09/27/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY K, J ON 09/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY K, J ON 09/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY K, J ON 09/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less