This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:32:03 (UTC).

IVAN MENDELSON VS. DANE ALLEN

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 IVAN MENDELSON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DANE ALLEN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

IVAN MENDELSON

LORI MENDELSON

Defendant

DANE ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVEN D. SILVERSTEIN

 

Court Documents

WRIT (ISSUED 10/25/17) RECEIVED ON 10/24/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED 10/25/17) RECEIVED ON 10/24/2017.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 04/30/2018

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 04/30/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/10/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/24/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/24/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/10/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/17/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/17/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233710 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057390.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233710 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057390.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN ON 11/03/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN ON 11/03/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/17/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/17/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/10/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/24/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/24/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/17/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/17/2017

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 10/24/17) RECEIVED ON 10/24/2017.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 10/24/17) RECEIVED ON 10/24/2017.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/30/2018.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/30/2018.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 04/30/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 04/30/2018

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 04/30/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 04/30/2018

JUDGMENT FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 05/01/2018

JUDGMENT FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 05/01/2018

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2018
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 05/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/30/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 04/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 04/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 04/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2665575 RECEIVED ON 04/28/2018 11:50:22 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN ON 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12242162 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12065880.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 10/25/17) RECEIVED ON 10/24/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3598029 RECEIVED ON 10/17/2017 10:17:31 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233710 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057390.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MENDELSON, IVAN; MENDELSON, LORI ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4775893 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 10:40:44 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.