This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 11:02:13 (UTC).

ISRAEL WEINBERG VS. ARMANDO BECERRIL

Case Summary

On 08/21/2017 ISRAEL WEINBERG filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ARMANDO BECERRIL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVID ALKOSSAR

ISRAEL WEINBERG

Defendants

ARMANDO BECERRIL

ANA MARIA BECERRIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVEN D. SILVERSTEIN

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY WEINBERG, ISRAEL ON 10/25/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY WEINBERG, ISRAEL ON 10/25/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY WEINBERG, ISRAEL; ALKOSSAR, DAVID ON 09/29/2017

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY WEINBERG, ISRAEL; ALKOSSAR, DAVID ON 09/29/2017

WRIT RECEIVED ON 10/02/2017.

WRIT RECEIVED ON 10/02/2017.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY WEINBERG, ISRAEL; ALKOSSAR, DAVID ON 10/02/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY WEINBERG, ISRAEL; ALKOSSAR, DAVID ON 10/02/2017

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 10/02/2017.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 10/02/2017.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ALKOSSAR, DAVID; WEINBERG, ISRAEL ON 09/25/2017

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ALKOSSAR, DAVID; WEINBERG, ISRAEL ON 09/25/2017

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/25/2017

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/25/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BECERRIL, ARMANDO ON 09/25/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BECERRIL, ARMANDO ON 09/25/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12220151 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12043855.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12220151 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12043855.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY ALKOSSAR, DAVID; WEINBERG, ISRAEL ON 09/12/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY ALKOSSAR, DAVID; WEINBERG, ISRAEL ON 09/12/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY ALKOSSAR, DAVID; WEINBERG, ISRAEL ON 09/12/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY ALKOSSAR, DAVID; WEINBERG, ISRAEL ON 09/12/2017

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BECERRIL, ARMANDO ON 09/11/2017

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BECERRIL, ARMANDO ON 09/11/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2591081 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2591081 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4765812 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4765812 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12207175 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12030883.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12207175 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12030883.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WEINBERG, ISRAEL; ALKOSSAR, DAVID ON 08/21/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WEINBERG, ISRAEL; ALKOSSAR, DAVID ON 08/21/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY WEINBERG, ISRAEL; ALKOSSAR, DAVID ON 08/21/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY WEINBERG, ISRAEL; ALKOSSAR, DAVID ON 08/21/2017

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY WEINBERG, ISRAEL ON 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY WEINBERG, ISRAEL; ALKOSSAR, DAVID ON 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12229791 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12053446.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT RECEIVED ON 10/02/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY WEINBERG, ISRAEL; ALKOSSAR, DAVID ON 10/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 10/02/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1426190 RECEIVED ON 10/02/2017 10:45:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BECERRIL, ARMANDO ON 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4766403 RECEIVED ON 09/11/2017 01:47:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2591081 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4765812 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12207175 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12030883.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WEINBERG, ISRAEL; ALKOSSAR, DAVID ON 08/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WEINBERG, ISRAEL; ALKOSSAR, DAVID ON 08/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY WEINBERG, ISRAEL; ALKOSSAR, DAVID ON 08/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3578951 RECEIVED ON 08/21/2017 12:04:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less