Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/11/2019 at 07:25:09 (UTC).

ISAAC STRAUS VS. AMERICAN MOTORS

Case Summary

On 04/10/2018 ISAAC STRAUS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN MOTORS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ISAAC STRAUS

Defendant

AMERICAN MOTORS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick E. Smith

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY STRAUS, ISAAC ON 10/17/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY STRAUS, ISAAC ON 10/17/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 09/24/2018 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 09/24/2018 09:00:00 AM.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY STRAUS, ISAAC ON 09/24/2018

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY STRAUS, ISAAC ON 09/24/2018

MOTION - OTHER SUBMITTED BY STRAUS, ISAAC REJECTED ON 09/18/2018.

MOTION - OTHER SUBMITTED BY STRAUS, ISAAC REJECTED ON 09/18/2018.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY SUBMITTED BY STRAUS, ISAAC REJECTED ON 09/11/2018.

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY SUBMITTED BY STRAUS, ISAAC REJECTED ON 09/11/2018.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/24/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/24/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

AT ISSUE MEMORANDUM (COUNTER MEMORANDUM) FILED BY STRAUS, ISAAC ON 05/31/2018

AT ISSUE MEMORANDUM (COUNTER MEMORANDUM) FILED BY STRAUS, ISAAC ON 05/31/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AHVAZI, ALI FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12346404 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12170100.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AHVAZI, ALI FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12346404 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12170100.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN MOTORS ON 05/09/2018

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN MOTORS ON 05/09/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STRAUS, ISAAC ON 05/09/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STRAUS, ISAAC ON 05/09/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STRAUS, ISAAC ON 04/10/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STRAUS, ISAAC ON 04/10/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STRAUS, ISAAC ON 04/10/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STRAUS, ISAAC ON 04/10/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY STRAUS, ISAAC ON 04/10/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY STRAUS, ISAAC ON 04/10/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY STRAUS, ISAAC FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12328268 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12152008.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY STRAUS, ISAAC FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12328268 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12152008.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY STRAUS, ISAAC ON 10/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1551749 RECEIVED ON 10/17/2018 10:12:33 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 09/24/2018 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/14/2018 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT C3.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/14/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY STRAUS, ISAAC ON 09/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3711977 RECEIVED ON 09/23/2018 06:42:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION - OTHER SUBMITTED BY STRAUS, ISAAC REJECTED ON 09/18/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY SUBMITTED BY STRAUS, ISAAC REJECTED ON 09/11/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/24/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AT ISSUE MEMORANDUM (COUNTER MEMORANDUM) FILED BY STRAUS, ISAAC ON 05/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AHVAZI, ALI FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12346404 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12170100.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN MOTORS ON 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STRAUS, ISAAC ON 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY STRAUS, ISAAC FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12328268 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12152008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STRAUS, ISAAC ON 04/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STRAUS, ISAAC ON 04/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY STRAUS, ISAAC ON 04/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN MOTORS CORPORATION is a litigant