This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/13/2022 at 03:12:02 (UTC).

IRVINE SPECTRUM CENTER LLC VS. DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 IRVINE SPECTRUM CENTER LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Irvine Company, LLC

Irvine Spectrum Center LLC

Defendant

Drybar Holdings LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bewley Lassleben & Miller, LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY IRVINE SPECTRUM CENTER LLC; THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 01/27/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY IRVINE SPECTRUM CENTER LLC; THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 01/27/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IRVINE SPECTRUM CENTER LLC; THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 01/27/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IRVINE SPECTRUM CENTER LLC; THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 01/27/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IRVINE SPECTRUM CENTER LLC; THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 01/27/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IRVINE SPECTRUM CENTER LLC; THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 01/27/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12837238 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12664671.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12837238 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12664671.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/08/2021 09:27:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/08/2021 09:27:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY IRVINE SPECTRUM CENTER LLC; THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 09/01/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY IRVINE SPECTRUM CENTER LLC; THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 09/01/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY IRVINE SPECTRUM CENTER LLC; THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 11/15/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY IRVINE SPECTRUM CENTER LLC; THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 11/15/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY IRVINE SPECTRUM CENTER LLC; THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 11/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1918212 RECEIVED ON 11/15/2021 01:15:39 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY IRVINE SPECTRUM CENTER LLC; THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 09/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1889425 RECEIVED ON 09/01/2021 03:00:48 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELOCATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/08/2021 09:27:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketTHE COURT TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/24/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 01/24/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SALTER, GLENN ON 01/27/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12837238 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12664671.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IRVINE SPECTRUM CENTER LLC; THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 01/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IRVINE SPECTRUM CENTER LLC; THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 01/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY IRVINE SPECTRUM CENTER LLC; THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 01/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3975228 RECEIVED ON 01/27/2021 09:32:25 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Irvine Spectrum Center LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Drybar Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Irvine Company, LLC is a litigant