This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 09:26:32 (UTC).

IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT VS. ORANGE COUNTY WATER DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 03/29/2022 IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ORANGE COUNTY WATER DISTRICT. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Irvine Ranch Water District

Defendant

Orange County Water District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alston & Bird LLP

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/30/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/30/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 03/29/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 03/29/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 03/29/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 03/29/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 03/29/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 03/29/2022

NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 06/09/2022

NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 06/09/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/06/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/06/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 06/01/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 06/01/2022

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 06/13/2022

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 06/13/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/28/2022 12:08:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/28/2022 12:08:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC. FOR 39 - CHANGE OF VENUE IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13070286 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12898282.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC. FOR 39 - CHANGE OF VENUE IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13070286 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12898282.

COURT DOCUMENT (NOTICE OF TRANSFER RECLASSIFICATION AND/OR CONSOLIDATION) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/06/2022

COURT DOCUMENT (NOTICE OF TRANSFER RECLASSIFICATION AND/OR CONSOLIDATION) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/06/2022

CASE FILE CONTENTS TRANSFERRED TO RECEIVING COURT LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER. .

CASE FILE CONTENTS TRANSFERRED TO RECEIVING COURT LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER. .

COURT DOCUMENT (CLERK'S CERTIFICATE AND RECEIPT FOR TRANSFER OF RECORD) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/19/2022

COURT DOCUMENT (CLERK'S CERTIFICATE AND RECEIPT FOR TRANSFER OF RECORD) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/19/2022

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT DOCUMENT (CLERK'S CERTIFICATE AND RECEIPT FOR TRANSFER OF RECORD) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILE CONTENTS TRANSFERRED TO RECEIVING COURT LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER. .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT DOCUMENT (NOTICE OF TRANSFER RECLASSIFICATION AND/OR CONSOLIDATION) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC. FOR 39 - CHANGE OF VENUE IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13070286 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12898282.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/28/2022 12:08:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 08/11/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C20.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketTHE COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER BE TRANSFERRED TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES 111 N. HILL STREET, LOS ANGELES, CA?? 90012 UPON PAYMENT OF ALL THE NECESSARY FEES REQUIRED BY LAW. THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IS AUTHORIZED TO TRANSFER ALL THE PLEADINGS AND PAPERS TO THE CLERK OF THE RECEIVING COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/11/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1996893 RECEIVED ON 06/06/2022 09:50:52 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41345104 RECEIVED ON 06/09/2022 03:53:27 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 06/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41341684 RECEIVED ON 06/01/2022 04:06:51 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/30/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41315926 RECEIVED ON 03/29/2022 06:40:28 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HURWITZ, LON ON 03/29/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 03/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 03/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 03/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Orange County Water District is a litigant