This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 12:32:20 (UTC).

IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT VS. ORANGE COUNTY WATER DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against ORANGE COUNTY WATER DISTRICT. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

Irvine Ranch Water District

Defendant and Respondent

Orange County Water District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

Alston & Bird LLP

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 06/21/2021

PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 06/21/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 06/21/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 06/21/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 06/21/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 06/21/2021

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 06/21/2021

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 06/21/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/14/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/14/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/04/2021 11:53:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/04/2021 11:53:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 07/28/2021

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 07/28/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 08/19/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 08/19/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC. FOR 39 - CHANGE OF VENUE IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12932275 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12760178.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC. FOR 39 - CHANGE OF VENUE IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12932275 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12760178.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER RECLASSIFICATION AND/OR CONSOLIDATION

NOTICE OF TRANSFER RECLASSIFICATION AND/OR CONSOLIDATION

CASE FILE CONTENTS TRANSFERRED TO RECEIVING COURT LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER. .

CASE FILE CONTENTS TRANSFERRED TO RECEIVING COURT LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER. .

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE AND RECEIPT FOR TRANSFER OF RECORDS

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE AND RECEIPT FOR TRANSFER OF RECORDS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE AND RECEIPT FOR TRANSFER OF RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILE CONTENTS TRANSFERRED TO RECEIVING COURT LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER. .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRANSFER RECLASSIFICATION AND/OR CONSOLIDATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC. FOR 39 - CHANGE OF VENUE IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12932275 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12760178.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 08/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41230689 RECEIVED ON 08/19/2021 10:41:34 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1870370 RECEIVED ON 07/14/2021 03:21:54 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/04/2021 11:53:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 09/03/2021 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C34.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketTHE COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER BE TRANSFERRED TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES 111 N. HILL STREET, LOS ANGELES, CALIFORNIA 90012 UPON PAYMENT OF ALL THE NECESSARY FEES REQUIRED BY LAW. THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IS AUTHORIZED TO TRANSFER ALL THE PLEADINGS AND PAPERS TO THE CLERK OF THE RECEIVING COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/03/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 07/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31029743 RECEIVED ON 06/21/2021 02:58:04 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER ZELTZER, NANCY ON 06/21/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 06/21/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 06/21/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 06/21/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 06/21/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Orange County Water District is a litigant

Latest cases where IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA WATER DISTRICT is a litigant