Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/19/2018 at 10:28:36 (UTC).

IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. VS. LOWELL HILES

Case Summary

On 10/24/2016 IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LOWELL HILES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P.

Defendant

LOWELL HILES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUZICKA, WALLACE & COUGHLIN, LLP.

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 01/30/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 01/30/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12067668 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11891613.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12067668 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11891613.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 11/28/16) RECEIVED ON 11/23/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 11/28/16) RECEIVED ON 11/23/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/28/16) RECEIVED ON 11/23/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/28/16) RECEIVED ON 11/23/2016.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/28/16) RECEIVED ON 11/23/2016.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/28/16) RECEIVED ON 11/23/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 11/23/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 11/23/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 11/23/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 11/23/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 11/23/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 11/23/2016

APPLICATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 11/03/2016

APPLICATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 11/03/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12056495 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11880460.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12056495 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11880460.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 11/02/2016.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 11/02/2016.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12050679 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11874624.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12050679 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11874624.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 10/24/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 10/24/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 10/24/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 10/24/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 10/24/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 10/24/2016

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 01/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12067668 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11891613.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 11/28/16) RECEIVED ON 11/23/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/28/16) RECEIVED ON 11/23/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/28/16) RECEIVED ON 11/23/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 11/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 11/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 11/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 11/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12056495 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11880460.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 11/02/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1352483 RECEIVED ON 11/02/2016 05:10:51 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12050679 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11874624.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 10/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 10/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES L.P. ON 10/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4625310 RECEIVED ON 10/24/2016 04:11:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant