This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 05:59:56 (UTC).

IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. VS. JAMES TENNIS

Case Summary

On 06/16/2017 IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JAMES TENNIS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P.

Defendant

JAMES TENNIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 08/07/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 08/07/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12190331 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12014031.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12190331 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12014031.

WRIT (ISSUED 7/20/2017) RECEIVED ON 07/19/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED 7/20/2017) RECEIVED ON 07/19/2017.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED 7/20/2017) FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 07/19/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED 7/20/2017) FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 07/19/2017

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 7/20/2017) FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 07/19/2017

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 7/20/2017) FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 07/19/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 07/19/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 07/19/2017 09:00:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (AS TO ANSWER) FILED BY TENNIS, JAMES ON 07/05/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (AS TO ANSWER) FILED BY TENNIS, JAMES ON 07/05/2017

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/19/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/19/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 06/30/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 06/30/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 06/30/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 06/30/2017

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 06/30/2017

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 06/30/2017

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/22/2017

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/22/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TENNIS, JAMES ON 06/22/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TENNIS, JAMES ON 06/22/2017

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12173309 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11997011.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12173309 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11997011.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 06/16/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 06/16/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 06/16/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 06/16/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 06/16/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 06/16/2017

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12190331 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12014031.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 7/20/2017) RECEIVED ON 07/19/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED 7/20/2017) FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 7/20/2017) FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1402378 RECEIVED ON 07/19/2017 05:24:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 07/19/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • POSSESSION OF THE FOLLOWING PROPERTY: 274 KNOLLGLEN, IRVINE, CA 92614 IS AWARDED TO PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • TENNIS, JAMES REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 06/22/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY TENNIS, JAMES ON 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TENNIS, JAMES ON 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12173309 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11997011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1392247 RECEIVED ON 06/16/2017 03:13:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less