This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:28:03 (UTC).

INTERNATIONAL MONETARY VS. DSG GLOBAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 INTERNATIONAL MONETARY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DSG GLOBAL, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INTERNATIONAL MONETARY

BLAINE RILEY

Defendant

DSG GLOBAL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BUCHALTER

Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF MARTY O'TOOLE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY INTERNATIONAL MONETARY; RILEY, BLAINE ON 08/14/2018

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY INTERNATIONAL MONETARY; RILEY, BLAINE ON 08/14/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RILEY, BLAINE; INTERNATIONAL MONETARY ON 01/18/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RILEY, BLAINE; INTERNATIONAL MONETARY ON 01/18/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DSG GLOBAL, INC. ON 03/19/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DSG GLOBAL, INC. ON 03/19/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/19/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/19/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12286181 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12109915.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12286181 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12109915.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED BY DSG GLOBAL, INC. ON 02/27/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED BY DSG GLOBAL, INC. ON 02/27/2018

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY DSG GLOBAL, INC. ON 01/19/2018

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY DSG GLOBAL, INC. ON 01/19/2018

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY DSG GLOBAL, INC. ON 01/19/2018

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY DSG GLOBAL, INC. ON 01/19/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR REVIEW HEARING 07/11/2018 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR REVIEW HEARING 07/11/2018 08:30:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING FILED BY DSG GLOBAL, INC. ON 01/19/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING FILED BY DSG GLOBAL, INC. ON 01/19/2018

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY RILEY, BLAINE; INTERNATIONAL MONETARY ON 01/24/2018

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY RILEY, BLAINE; INTERNATIONAL MONETARY ON 01/24/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 07/15/2019 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 07/15/2019 08:30:00 AM.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY INTERNATIONAL MONETARY ON 06/04/2018

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY INTERNATIONAL MONETARY ON 06/04/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 08/14/2018 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 08/14/2018 08:30:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12287527 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12111277.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12287527 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12111277.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY RILEY, BLAINE; INTERNATIONAL MONETARY ON 11/17/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY RILEY, BLAINE; INTERNATIONAL MONETARY ON 11/17/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY INTERNATIONAL MONETARY; RILEY, BLAINE ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY INTERNATIONAL MONETARY; RILEY, BLAINE ON 10/10/2017

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/19/2018.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/19/2018.

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 07/15/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • THE ADR REVIEW HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/18/2019 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • ADR REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/18/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 01/14/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS SCHEDULED FOR 07/15/2019 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SCHEDULED FOR 07/15/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY RILEY, BLAINE; INTERNATIONAL MONETARY ON 11/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2734584 RECEIVED ON 11/19/2018 02:02:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR REVIEW HEARING 11/19/2018 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/14/2019 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C33.

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2631428 RECEIVED ON 01/18/2018 12:20:09 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY RILEY, BLAINE; INTERNATIONAL MONETARY ON 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3609132 RECEIVED ON 11/17/2017 03:57:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/24/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 10/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234249 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057928.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY INTERNATIONAL MONETARY; RILEY, BLAINE ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY INTERNATIONAL MONETARY; RILEY, BLAINE ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY INTERNATIONAL MONETARY; RILEY, BLAINE ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3596010 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 05:20:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.