This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:25:40 (UTC).

IN RE: T. BACHMAN

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 IN RE T BACHMAN was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC

Defendant

T. BACHMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GREENBERG & BASS LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12235691 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12059371.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12235691 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12059371.

STIPULATION TO JUDGE PRO TEM (STEVEN SIEFERT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/22/2017

STIPULATION TO JUDGE PRO TEM (STEVEN SIEFERT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/22/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 10/26/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 10/26/2017

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 10/10/2017.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 10/10/2017.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3596403 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3596403 REJECTED.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/11/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/11/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/21/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/21/2017

EXHIBIT LIST (AMENDED EXHIBIT A TO PETITION) FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 10/26/2017

EXHIBIT LIST (AMENDED EXHIBIT A TO PETITION) FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 10/26/2017

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 10/10/2017

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 10/10/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 10/11/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 10/11/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 10/13/2017 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 10/13/2017 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) MOTION - OTHER 12/22/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) MOTION - OTHER 12/22/2017 09:00:00 AM.

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 12/22/2017

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 12/22/2017

PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 10/10/2017

PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 10/10/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234414 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12058093.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234414 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12058093.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 10/11/2017

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 10/11/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 10/10/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/11/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/11/2017

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2017
  • PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION HAS BEEN GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1452108 RECEIVED ON 12/21/2017 11:56:21 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) MOTION - OTHER 12/22/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION TO JUDGE PRO TEM (STEVEN SIEFERT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBIT LIST (AMENDED EXHIBIT A TO PETITION) FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1434640 RECEIVED ON 10/26/2017 11:09:03 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3596403 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3596383 RECEIVED ON 10/11/2017 03:50:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • (P) MOTION - OTHER SCHEDULED FOR 12/22/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 10/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234414 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12058093.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION FILED BY PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2601190 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 04:56:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.