This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:53:09 (UTC).

IN RE: NICHOLAS GARCIA VILLA

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 IN RE NICHOLAS GARCIA VILLA was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALLSTATE SETTLEMENT CORPORATION

Defendant

NICHOLAS GARCIA VILLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALLSTATE SETTLEMENT CORPORATION ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALLSTATE SETTLEMENT CORPORATION ON 02/26/2016

PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION FILED BY ALLSTATE SETTLEMENT CORPORATION ON 02/26/2016

PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION FILED BY ALLSTATE SETTLEMENT CORPORATION ON 02/26/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/16/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/16/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/15/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/15/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4512160 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4512160 REJECTED.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 02/26/2016.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/03/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/03/2016

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ALLSTATE SETTLEMENT CORPORATION ON 06/03/2016

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ALLSTATE SETTLEMENT CORPORATION ON 06/03/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLSTATE SETTLEMENT CORPORATION ON 03/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLSTATE SETTLEMENT CORPORATION ON 03/15/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11930463 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11754663.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11930463 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11754663.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4517520 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4517520 REJECTED.

MOTION - OTHER (APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT) FILED BY ALLSTATE SETTLEMENT CORPORATION ON 03/03/2016

MOTION - OTHER (APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT) FILED BY ALLSTATE SETTLEMENT CORPORATION ON 03/03/2016

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY ALLSTATE SETTLEMENT CORPORATION ON 05/31/2016

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY ALLSTATE SETTLEMENT CORPORATION ON 05/31/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928836 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11753054.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928836 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11753054.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 05/13/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 05/13/2016 09:00:00 AM.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ALLSTATE SETTLEMENT CORPORATION ON 06/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1325539 RECEIVED ON 06/03/2016 09:22:08 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER FILED BY ALLSTATE SETTLEMENT CORPORATION ON 05/31/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3414316 RECEIVED ON 05/16/2016 03:00:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4517520 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4512160 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION HAS BEEN GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 05/13/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2016
  • MOTION - OTHER SCHEDULED FOR 05/13/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11930463 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11754663.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION - OTHER (APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT) FILED BY ALLSTATE SETTLEMENT CORPORATION ON 03/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4512159 RECEIVED ON 03/03/2016 10:52:31 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928836 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11753054.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALLSTATE SETTLEMENT CORPORATION ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION FILED BY ALLSTATE SETTLEMENT CORPORATION ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446682 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 12:30:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.