This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/09/2022 at 06:41:33 (UTC).

IN RE: E.S.

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 IN RE E S was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sequoia Companies, LLC

Defendant

E.S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Yassin Law, APC

 

Court Documents

PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION FILED BY SEQUOIA COMPANIES, LLC ON 10/27/2021

PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION FILED BY SEQUOIA COMPANIES, LLC ON 10/27/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SEQUOIA COMPANIES, LLC ON 10/27/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SEQUOIA COMPANIES, LLC ON 10/27/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12963767 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12791690.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12963767 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12791690.

MOTION - OTHER (MOTION FOR ORDER) FILED BY SEQUOIA COMPANIES, LLC ON 11/02/2021

MOTION - OTHER (MOTION FOR ORDER) FILED BY SEQUOIA COMPANIES, LLC ON 11/02/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12966166 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12794089.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12966166 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12794089.

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY SEQUOIA COMPANIES, LLC ON 12/30/2021

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY SEQUOIA COMPANIES, LLC ON 12/30/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • HearingDescription: MOTION - OTHER; Judge: SUPERVISING; Department: C12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY SEQUOIA COMPANIES, LLC ON 12/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1934252 RECEIVED ON 12/30/2021 12:09:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketMOTION - OTHER SCHEDULED FOR 01/27/2022 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12966166 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12794089.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31081463 RECEIVED ON 11/02/2021 12:47:10 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - OTHER (MOTION FOR ORDER) FILED BY SEQUOIA COMPANIES, LLC ON 11/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12963767 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12791690.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31079495 RECEIVED ON 10/27/2021 04:44:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SUPERVISING ON 10/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SEQUOIA COMPANIES, LLC ON 10/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION FILED BY SEQUOIA COMPANIES, LLC ON 10/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where E.S. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sequoia Companies, LLC is a litigant