This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/06/2017 16:11:58

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by Ilia Kulik against Ekaterina Gordeeva in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXX1701
  • Filing Date 02/26/2016
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce
  • Jurisdiction Orange County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Lamoreaux Justice Center
  • County Orange
  • State California

Party Details

  • Petitioner Kulik, Ilia
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Respondent Gordeeva, Ekaterina
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2016
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 06/07/2016; Filing Party: KULIK, ILIA
  • 06/07/2016
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 06/07/2016; Filing Party: KULIK, ILIA
  • 04/28/2016
  • RETURN SHEET - DEFAULT 04/28/2016
  • 04/12/2016
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 04/12/2016; Filing Party: KULIK, ILIA
  • 04/12/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/12/2016; Filing Party: KULIK, ILIA
  • 04/12/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/12/2016; Filing Party: GORDEEVA, EKATERINA
  • 04/12/2016
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/12/2016; Filing Party: KULIK, ILIA
  • 04/12/2016
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 04/12/2016; Filing Party: KULIK, ILIA
  • 03/04/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/04/2016; Filing Party: KULIK, ILIA
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: KULIK, ILIA
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 02/26/2016; Filing Party: KULIK, ILIA
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: KULIK, ILIA
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: KULIK, ILIA

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.