This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 08:07:23 (UTC).

IGOR ENRIQUEZ VS. AMERICOLD LOGISTICS, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 IGOR ENRIQUEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AMERICOLD LOGISTICS, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Igor Enriquez

Defendants

Americold Logistics, LLC

Humberto Flores

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arthur Kim Law Firm

Defendant Attorney

Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete LLP

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/06/2023 11:24:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/06/2023 11:24:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ENRIQUEZ, IGOR ON 01/03/2023

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ENRIQUEZ, IGOR ON 01/03/2023

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ENRIQUEZ, IGOR ON 01/03/2023

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ENRIQUEZ, IGOR ON 01/03/2023

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICOLD LOGISTICS, LLC; FLORES, HUMBERTO ON 12/27/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICOLD LOGISTICS, LLC; FLORES, HUMBERTO ON 12/27/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICOLD LOGISTICS, LLC; FLORES, HUMBERTO ON 10/27/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICOLD LOGISTICS, LLC; FLORES, HUMBERTO ON 10/27/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13130239 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12958310.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13130239 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12958310.

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY ENRIQUEZ, IGOR ON 11/01/2022

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY ENRIQUEZ, IGOR ON 11/01/2022

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY ENRIQUEZ, IGOR ON 11/01/2022

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY ENRIQUEZ, IGOR ON 11/01/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ENRIQUEZ, IGOR ON 11/01/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ENRIQUEZ, IGOR ON 11/01/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/01/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/01/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13123449 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12951514.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13123449 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12951514.

MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES FILED BY AMERICOLD LOGISTICS, LLC; FLORES, HUMBERTO ON 10/18/2022

MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES FILED BY AMERICOLD LOGISTICS, LLC; FLORES, HUMBERTO ON 10/18/2022

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/19/2022 08:41:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/19/2022 08:41:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13120751 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12948814.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13120751 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12948814.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 10/10/2022

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 10/10/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY ENRIQUEZ, IGOR ON 10/06/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY ENRIQUEZ, IGOR ON 10/06/2022

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • HearingDescription: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND; Judge: GOODING; Department: C31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GOODING; Department: C31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; Judge: GOODING; Department: C31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/06/2023 11:24:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 03/06/2023 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ENRIQUEZ, IGOR ON 01/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11083317 RECEIVED ON 01/01/2023 03:48:29 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ENRIQUEZ, IGOR ON 01/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41429497 RECEIVED ON 01/01/2023 03:48:27 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/26/2022 03:02:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketTHE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SET ON 01/23/2023 IS ORDERED ADVANCED TO 01/09/2023 AT 09:00 AM IN C14.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/09/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/23/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13090229 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12918219.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11024006 RECEIVED ON 08/10/2022 01:46:43 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DOURBETAS, NICO ON 08/10/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ENRIQUEZ, IGOR ON 08/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ENRIQUEZ, IGOR ON 08/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ENRIQUEZ, IGOR ON 08/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less