This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 09:42:55 (UTC).

IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC VS. BRADLEY WATSON

Case Summary

On 02/16/2016 IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BRADLEY WATSON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC

Defendants

BRADLEY WATSON

JACQUELINE WATSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUZICKA, WALLACE & COUGHLIN, LLP.

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 03/07/2018

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 03/07/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12204981 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12028701.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12204981 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12028701.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 08/08/2017

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 08/08/2017

WRIT (08/16/2017 ISSUED) RECEIVED ON 08/08/2017.

WRIT (08/16/2017 ISSUED) RECEIVED ON 08/08/2017.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12199307 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12023047.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12199307 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12023047.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 07/21/2017

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 07/21/2017

WRIT (ISSUED ON 8/7/17) RECEIVED ON 07/21/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 8/7/17) RECEIVED ON 07/21/2017.

JUDGMENT FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 04/20/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 04/20/2016

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/20/2016

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/20/2016

PROPOSED ORDER (ADMITTING COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) RECEIVED ON 04/06/2016.

PROPOSED ORDER (ADMITTING COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) RECEIVED ON 04/06/2016.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/06/2016.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/06/2016.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 04/06/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 04/06/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 04/06/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 04/06/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 04/06/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 04/06/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 04/01/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 04/01/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/06/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/06/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11931724 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11755909.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11931724 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11755909.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 03/07/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/04/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 03/07/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/04/2016.

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 03/07/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12204981 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12028701.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 08/08/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (08/16/2017 ISSUED) RECEIVED ON 08/08/2017.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2580567 RECEIVED ON 08/08/2017 10:11:30 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12199307 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12023047.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 07/21/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (ISSUED ON 8/7/17) RECEIVED ON 07/21/2017.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3569203 RECEIVED ON 07/21/2017 04:33:01 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 03/04/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 03/04/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 03/04/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4513238 RECEIVED ON 03/04/2016 04:21:31 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11921152 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11745349.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 02/16/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 02/16/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC ON 02/16/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3381136 RECEIVED ON 02/16/2016 09:08:58 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IAC AT JAMBOREE LLC is a litigant