This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/24/2019 at 09:57:03 (UTC).

HUYNH V HUYNH

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 HUYNH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HUYNH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LARSH, ERICK L. and WILSON, RENEE E.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2906

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judges

LARSH, ERICK L.

WILSON, RENEE E.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald H. Huynh

Petitioner

HUYNH, DONALD HOWARD

Defendant

Joanna H. Huynh

Respondent

HUYNH, JOANNA HA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer S. Colarossi

Defendant Attorney

Werno & Associates

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2019
  • HEARING - OSC - CONTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT 01/18/2019 of Unsuccessful Service; Filing Party: HUYNH, JOANNA HA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT 01/18/2019 of Unsuccessful Service; Filing Party: HUYNH, JOANNA HA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • ACCEPT - WILSON - STIP TO COMMISSIONER - ALL PURPOSES 01/18/2019; Filing Party: HUYNH, JOANNA HA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • ORDER - REQUEST TO CONTINUE - GRANTED 01/18/2019; Filing Party: HUYNH, JOANNA HA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DECLARATION - DUE DILIGENCE 01/18/2019; Filing Party: HUYNH, JOANNA HA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • MINUTE ORDER 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • HEARING - OSC - CONTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • NOTICE - JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT 12/12/2018 H13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 11/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2013
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 06/27/2013 11:19:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: HUYNH, JOANNA HA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • NOTICE - CONTINUANCE 06/10/2013 14:36:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: HUYNH, DONALD HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUED BY STIPULATION 06/03/2013 08:45:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • HEARING - RFO - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • NOTICE - OTHER 05/10/2013 15:50:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: HUYNH, DONALD HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 04/17/2013 14:36:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: HUYNH, DONALD HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 03/27/2013 08:13:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: HUYNH, DONALD HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • SUMMONS 03/27/2013 08:13:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: HUYNH, DONALD HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 03/27/2013 08:12:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: HUYNH, DONALD HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • OSC - OTHER 03/27/2013 08:31:00 # Pages:9; Filing Party: HUYNH, DONALD HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less