This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/17/2017 at 07:53:08 (UTC).

HURLEY VS. GROUP INDEPENDENT SALES ORGANIZATION, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2013 HURLEY filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GROUP INDEPENDENT SALES ORGANIZATION, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TYLER HURLEY

Defendants

GROUP SALES ORGANIZATION, INC.

GROUP INDEPENDENT SALES ORGANIZATION, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOEL W. BARUCH

Defendant Attorney

NEWPORT TRIAL GROUP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY HURLEY, TYLER ON 01/25/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY HURLEY, TYLER ON 01/25/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HURLEY, TYLER ON 01/25/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HURLEY, TYLER ON 01/25/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HURLEY, TYLER ON 01/25/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HURLEY, TYLER ON 01/25/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11305525 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11129417.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11305525 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11129417.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MILLER, FRANZ ON 01/25/2013.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MILLER, FRANZ ON 01/25/2013.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY HURLEY, TYLER ON 02/01/2013

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY HURLEY, TYLER ON 02/01/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11308279 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11132171.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11308279 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11132171.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HURLEY, TYLER ON 02/11/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HURLEY, TYLER ON 02/11/2013

STIPULATION - OTHER RECEIVED ON 03/20/2013.

STIPULATION - OTHER RECEIVED ON 03/20/2013.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11336633 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11160525.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11336633 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11160525.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY GROUP INDEPENDENT SALES ORGANIZATION, INC. ON 03/21/2013

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY GROUP INDEPENDENT SALES ORGANIZATION, INC. ON 03/21/2013

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/10/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/10/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

STIPULATION - OTHER RECEIVED ON 05/06/2013.

STIPULATION - OTHER RECEIVED ON 05/06/2013.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11367046 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11190938.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11367046 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11190938.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY GROUP INDEPENDENT SALES ORGANIZATION, INC. ON 05/10/2013

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY GROUP INDEPENDENT SALES ORGANIZATION, INC. ON 05/10/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HURLEY, TYLER ON 06/05/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HURLEY, TYLER ON 06/05/2013

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2013
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HURLEY, TYLER ON 06/05/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 326822 RECEIVED ON 06/05/2013 10:57:39 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER (TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY GROUP INDEPENDENT SALES ORGANIZATION, INC. ON 05/10/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11367046 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11190938.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER RECEIVED ON 05/06/2013.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 190890 RECEIVED ON 05/06/2013 02:23:09 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/10/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER (TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY GROUP INDEPENDENT SALES ORGANIZATION, INC. ON 03/21/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2013
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 152524 RECEIVED ON 02/11/2013 04:35:21 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11308279 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11132171.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY HURLEY, TYLER ON 02/01/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2197102 RECEIVED ON 02/01/2013 02:56:40 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MILLER, FRANZ ON 01/25/2013.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11305525 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11129417.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HURLEY, TYLER ON 01/25/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HURLEY, TYLER ON 01/25/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY HURLEY, TYLER ON 01/25/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2013
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2192028 RECEIVED ON 01/25/2013 04:15:08 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less