This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 00:14:41 (UTC).

HUONG VY VS. PAUL C NGUYEN

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 HUONG VY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PAUL C NGUYEN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUONG VY

Defendants

CHAD T PRATT

PAUL C NGUYEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2013
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 10/15/2013 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 08 - REQUEST TO POSTPONE HEARING IF DEFENDANT SERVED IN THE AMOUNT OF 10.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11477353 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11301265.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY PRATT, CHAD T ON 10/10/2013; Filing Party: PRATT, CHAD T ON 10/10/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/15/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H13 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL REASSIGNED TO H13 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH ON 10/15/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SUBMITTED BY PRATT, CHAD T REJECTED ON 10/04/2013.; Filing Party: O POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SUBMITTED BY PRATT, CHAD T REJECTED ON 10/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • DISBURSEMENT ON TRUST 300458 TO THE TU FIRM, APLC ISSUED IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00 DUE TO OVER PAYMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY VY, HUONG ON 08/30/2013; Filing Party: VY, HUONG ON 08/30/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000, OVERAGE TRUST > $10 IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431171 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11255043.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/15/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY VY, HUONG ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: VY, HUONG ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less