This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:22:23 (UTC).

HUONG TRAN VS PETER TRAN

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 HUONG TRAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PETER TRAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1690

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TRAN, HUONG L

Claimant

FIDELITY BROKERAGE SERVICES, LLC

Respondent

TRAN, PETER T

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 09/13/2017; Filing Party: TRAN, HUONG L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • RETURN SHEET - CLERKS OFFICE 09/01/2017 FL335

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • ORDER - WITHHOLD INCOME CHILD SUPPORT 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION - WAGE ASSIGNMENT ORDER 08/30/2017; Filing Party: TRAN, HUONG L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • RETURN SHEET - COURTROOM JUDGMENT / ORDER 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • ORDER - STIPULATION SUPPORT 07/27/2017; Filing Party: TRAN, HUONG L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • RETURN SHEET - COURTROOM JUDGMENT / ORDER 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • ORDER - WITHHOLD INCOME CHILD SUPPORT 03/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 02/27/2017; Filing Party: TRAN, HUONG L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 02/27/2017; Filing Party: TRAN, HUONG L

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2016
  • NOTICE - CASE REVIEW 08/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • RETURN SHEET - COURTROOM JUDGMENT / ORDER 06/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • SUMMONS - JOINDER 03/25/2016; Filing Party: TRAN, HUONG L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/25/2016; Filing Party: TRAN, HUONG L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST - JOINDER EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN & ORDER 02/26/2016; Filing Party: TRAN, HUONG L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLEADING JOINDER - EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN 02/26/2016; Filing Party: TRAN, HUONG L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: TRAN, HUONG L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 02/26/2016; Filing Party: TRAN, HUONG L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: TRAN, HUONG L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: TRAN, HUONG L

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.