This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/22/2021 at 05:47:42 (UTC).

HUGO DIVERS VS. AEROTEK, INC

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 HUGO DIVERS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against AEROTEK, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hugo Divers

Defendants

Aerotek, Inc

Fernando Calderon

Norman Blaise

SunPower Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yun & Simonian, PC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY DIVERS, HUGO ON 10/12/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY DIVERS, HUGO ON 10/12/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DIVERS, HUGO ON 10/12/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DIVERS, HUGO ON 10/12/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DIVERS, HUGO ON 10/12/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DIVERS, HUGO ON 10/12/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12956615 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12784512.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12956615 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12784512.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/17/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/17/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. GLEN SALTER) FILED BY DIVERS, HUGO ON 10/20/2021

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. GLEN SALTER) FILED BY DIVERS, HUGO ON 10/20/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SALTER; Department: N06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41254628 RECEIVED ON 10/20/2021 03:51:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. GLEN SALTER) FILED BY DIVERS, HUGO ON 10/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/17/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12956615 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12784512.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31073402 RECEIVED ON 10/12/2021 06:24:28 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SALTER, GLENN ON 10/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DIVERS, HUGO ON 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DIVERS, HUGO ON 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY DIVERS, HUGO ON 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sunpower Corporation Systems is a litigant

Latest cases where AEROTEK INC. A MARYLAND CORPORATION is a litigant