This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/10/2019 at 04:04:35 (UTC).

HUGO ALONZO VS KARINA MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 03/06/2017 HUGO ALONZO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KARINA MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SYKES, DAPHNE G.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1790

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

SYKES, DAPHNE G.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALONZO, HUGO RENE

Respondent

MARTINEZ, KARINA

Not Classified By Court

COUNTY OF ORANGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

DCSS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2017
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 09/29/2017; Filing Party: ALONZO, HUGO RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 09/28/2017; Filing Party: ALONZO, HUGO RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • ASSIGNMENT - COMMISSIONER OR TEMPORARY JUDGE - ALL PURPOSES 09/28/2017; Filing Party: ALONZO, HUGO RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • ASSIGNMENT - COMMISSIONER OR TEMPORARY JUDGE - ALL PURPOSES 09/28/2017; Filing Party: MARTINEZ, KARINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 09/28/2017; Filing Party: MARTINEZ, KARINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 09/28/2017; Filing Party: MARTINEZ, KARINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 09/28/2017; Filing Party: MARTINEZ, KARINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/28/2017; Filing Party: MARTINEZ, KARINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • TRIAL - SHORT CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2017
  • ORDER - ATTEND PARENT EDUCATION / MEDIATION APPOINTMENT 03/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/08/2017; Filing Party: ALONZO, HUGO RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 03/06/2017; Filing Party: ALONZO, HUGO RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION 03/06/2017 Community; Filing Party: ALONZO, HUGO RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION 03/06/2017 Separate; Filing Party: ALONZO, HUGO RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 03/06/2017; Filing Party: ALONZO, HUGO RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • SUMMONS 03/06/2017; Filing Party: ALONZO, HUGO RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 03/06/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: ALONZO, HUGO RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 03/06/2017; Filing Party: ALONZO, HUGO RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 03/06/2017; Filing Party: ALONZO, HUGO RENE

    Read MoreRead Less