This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/19/2022 at 03:42:11 (UTC).

HOUSHMAND ESHRAGHIAN VS. KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/06/2022 HOUSHMAND ESHRAGHIAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Houshmand Eshraghian

Defendants

Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC

Kindred Hospital Santa Ana

Kindred Hospitals West, L.L.C.

Scionhealth

The Regents of the University of California

Knight Health Holdings, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arendsen Braddock LLP

Chivinski Law Firm, APC

Defendant Attorney

Giovanniello Law Group

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/03/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/03/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13031752 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12859769.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13031752 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12859769.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ESHRAGHIAN, HOUSHMAND ON 04/06/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ESHRAGHIAN, HOUSHMAND ON 04/06/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY ESHRAGHIAN, HOUSHMAND ON 04/06/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY ESHRAGHIAN, HOUSHMAND ON 04/06/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ESHRAGHIAN, HOUSHMAND; KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC ON 04/18/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ESHRAGHIAN, HOUSHMAND; KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC ON 04/18/2022

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41320822 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41320822 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13064813 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12892806.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13064813 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12892806.

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SCIONHEALTH ON 06/16/2022

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SCIONHEALTH ON 06/16/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/16/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/16/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13059151 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12887152.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13059151 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12887152.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC; KINDRED HOSPITALS WEST, L.L.C. ON 06/06/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC; KINDRED HOSPITALS WEST, L.L.C. ON 06/06/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF TRIAL COUNSEL) FILED BY KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC; KINDRED HOSPITALS WEST, L.L.C. ON 06/06/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF TRIAL COUNSEL) FILED BY KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC; KINDRED HOSPITALS WEST, L.L.C. ON 06/06/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13058918 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12886934.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13058918 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12886934.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC; KINDRED HOSPITALS WEST, L.L.C. ON 06/03/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC; KINDRED HOSPITALS WEST, L.L.C. ON 06/03/2022

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC; KINDRED HOSPITALS WEST, L.L.C. ON 06/06/2022

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC; KINDRED HOSPITALS WEST, L.L.C. ON 06/06/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC; KINDRED HOSPITALS WEST, L.L.C. ON 06/06/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC; KINDRED HOSPITALS WEST, L.L.C. ON 06/06/2022

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; Judge: STRICKROTH; Department: C15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: STRICKROTH; Department: C15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31169882 RECEIVED ON 06/16/2022 02:21:20 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13064813 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12892806.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS SCHEDULED FOR 11/14/2022 AT 01:45:00 PM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SCIONHEALTH ON 06/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41343043 RECEIVED ON 06/06/2022 08:41:31 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13059151 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12887152.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1996852 RECEIVED ON 06/06/2022 08:41:28 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC; KINDRED HOSPITALS WEST, L.L.C. ON 06/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41323652 RECEIVED ON 04/18/2022 03:49:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ESHRAGHIAN, HOUSHMAND; KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC ON 04/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41320822 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21143651 RECEIVED ON 04/06/2022 03:56:51 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13031752 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12859769.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/03/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ESHRAGHIAN, HOUSHMAND ON 04/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ESHRAGHIAN, HOUSHMAND ON 04/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER STRICKROTH, MICHAEL ON 04/06/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINDRED HOSPITAL-SANTA ANA is a litigant

Latest cases where KINDRED HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant