This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/17/2017 at 13:16:30 (UTC).

HOLLY DYE VS ANDREW DYE

Case Summary

On 08/04/2017 HOLLY DYE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ANDREW DYE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WALTZ, JAMES L.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6463

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

WALTZ, JAMES L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DYE, HOLLY M

Respondent

DYE, ANDREW M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2017
  • HEARING - RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION / CHILD / SPOUS SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 09/26/2017; Filing Party: DYE, HOLLY M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 09/26/2017; Filing Party: DYE, HOLLY M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 09/26/2017 Judge:WALTZ, JAMES L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 09/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • HEARING - RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION / CHILD / SPOUS SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DECLARATION - NON APPEARANCE - MEDIATION APPOINTMENT 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • APPOINTMENT - PARENT EDUCATION / MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 09/07/2017; Filing Party: DYE, HOLLY M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/07/2017; Filing Party: DYE, HOLLY M

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 08/28/2017; Filing Party: DYE, HOLLY M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 08/21/2017; Filing Party: DYE, HOLLY M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 08/21/2017; Filing Party: DYE, HOLLY M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/04/2017; Filing Party: DYE, HOLLY M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 08/04/2017; Filing Party: DYE, HOLLY M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • SUMMONS 08/04/2017; Filing Party: DYE, HOLLY M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 08/04/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: DYE, HOLLY M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION / CHILD SUPPORT / SPOUSAL SUPPORT 08/04/2017 Amount:$60.00; Filing Party: DYE, HOLLY M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • ORDER - ATTEND PARENT EDUCATION / MEDIATION APPOINTMENT 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 08/04/2017; Filing Party: DYE, HOLLY M

    Read MoreRead Less